Global Patent Index - EP 1057179 A1

EP 1057179 A1 2000-12-06 - SYSTEM, METHOD AND INFORMATION CARRIER FOR LASER-STIMULATED MAGNETIC RECORDING

Title (en)

SYSTEM, METHOD AND INFORMATION CARRIER FOR LASER-STIMULATED MAGNETIC RECORDING

Title (de)

SYSTEM, VERFAHREN UND DATENTRÄGER ZUR LASER-STIMULIERTEN MAGNETISCHEN AUFZEICHNUNG

Title (fr)

SYSTEME, PROCEDE ET SUPPORT D'INFORMATIONS POUR ENREGISTREMENT MAGNETIQUE A STIMULATION PAR LASER

Publication

EP 1057179 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99966904 A

Priority

  • EP 9909139 W
  • US 10957098 P
  • US 42877199 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0031734A1] A magnetic disk has a layered configuration comprising a recordable layer (110) and a reflective layer (112). Laser-stimulated recording takes place by a magnetic head (102) that obstructs the laser beam for a minor portion. The converging laser beam traverses the recording layer and gets reflected at the reflective layer, whereupon it reaches its focus in the recordable layer. The head gets only a fraction of the radiation. This enables to keep the head's temperature well within control.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G11B 11/105

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G11B 5/00 (2006.01); G11B 11/105 (2006.01); G11B 13/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G11B 5/00 (2013.01); G11B 11/10536 (2013.01); G11B 11/10545 (2013.01); G11B 11/10554 (2013.01); G11B 11/10584 (2013.01); G11B 13/045 (2013.01); G11B 2005/0002 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0031734A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 0031734 A1 20000602; AU 2280000 A 20000613; BR 9907174 A 20001010; CN 1288563 A 20010321; EP 1057179 A1 20001206; HU 0103746 A2 20020328; JP 2003524852 A 20030819; PL 341939 A1 20010507; TW 455836 B 20010921

INPADOC legal status


2003-12-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030531

2002-02-27 [D18W] WITHDRAWAL (DELETED)

2002-02-20 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20011219

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001204

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL