Global Patent Index - EP 1057194 A1

EP 1057194 A1 2000-12-06 - ELECTRIC SWITCHING DEVICE WITH CLOSED-CIRCUIT PROTECTION

Title (en)

ELECTRIC SWITCHING DEVICE WITH CLOSED-CIRCUIT PROTECTION

Title (de)

ELEKTRISCHE SCHALTEINRICHTUNG MIT RUHESTROMÜBERWACHUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE COMMUTATION ELECTRIQUE AVEC SURVEILLANCE DE COURANT DE REPOS

Publication

EP 1057194 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 97953651 A

Priority

DE 9702976 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9933077A1] The invention relates to an electric switching device with a signalling element which triggers a switching function when the closed circuit is interrupted, a relay safety assembly being switched into the closed circuit. The incoming and outgoing electrical lines from the closed circuit to the signalling element are each surrounded by a safety shielding which is connected to the earth potential of the signalling element at one end and to the protective-conductor terminal of the relay safety assembly at the other end. The secondary circuit of the transformer in the relay safety assembly is connected to the safety shielding on one side.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 3/14; E05F 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05F 15/00 (2006.01); H01H 9/54 (2006.01); H01H 47/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 47/005 (2013.01); E05F 15/44 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/132 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9933077A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9933077 A1 19990701; AT 223106 T 20020915; DE 59708091 D1 20021002; EP 1057194 A1 20001206; EP 1057194 B1 20020828; ES 2183234 T3 20030316; JP 2001527269 A 20011225; US 6337786 B1 20020108

INPADOC legal status


2013-11-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081218

2010-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081219

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081231

2010-03-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20081219

2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090701

2009-10-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090831

2009-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081218

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20071214

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071031

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-02-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20071222

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-02-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20071220

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-01-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20071220

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-09-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060701

2006-08-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20051218

2006-08-22 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-07-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060701

2005-12-19 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051219

2005-12-18 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051218

2004-12-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20041228

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-12-20 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20041220

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-12-07 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20041207

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-08-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030530

2003-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2183234 T3

2003-02-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-12-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021129

2002-10-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59708091 20021002

2002-08-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

2002-08-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-08-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 223106 T 20020915

2002-07-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020610

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991111

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT NL SE