Global Patent Index - EP 1057210 A1

EP 1057210 A1 2000-12-06 - LIGHT SOURCE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME

Title (en)

LIGHT SOURCE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME

Title (de)

LICHTQUELLE UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

SOURCE LUMINEUSE ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE LA PRODUIRE

Publication

EP 1057210 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99904692 A

Priority

  • DE 9900006 W
  • DE 19802160 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19802160A1] A light source, consisting of semiconductor material (20) with one or more recesses (30, 40) filled with a gas or a liquid, is new. Independent claims are also included for the following: (i) an integrated electric circuit which includes the above light source; (ii) a display device which includes the above light source and/or the above integrated circuit; and (iii) a method of producing the above light source. Preferred Features: The recess (30, 40) is filled with a fluorescent gas containing Hg atoms, especially with addition of Tl, Na or Cd. The gas may also contain fluorine, an organic dyestuff and/or an aromatic hydrocarbon.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 61/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 17/49 (2012.01); H01J 61/30 (2006.01); H01J 65/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 61/30 (2013.01); H01J 17/49 (2013.01); H01J 65/046 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9938195A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19802160 A1 19990722; EP 1057210 A1 20001206; EP 1057210 B1 20030212; TW 409431 B 20001021; WO 9938195 A1 19990729

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170120

- Year of fee payment: 19

2004-02-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031113

2003-03-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59904273 P 20030320

2003-02-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE

2001-11-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010521

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000713

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE