Global Patent Index - EP 1057224 A1

EP 1057224 A1 2000-12-06 - DUAL-POLARIZED DIPOLE ANTENNA

Title (en)

DUAL-POLARIZED DIPOLE ANTENNA

Title (de)

DUALPOLARISIERTER DIPOLSTRAHLER

Title (fr)

DIFFUSEUR DIPOLAIRE A DOUBLE POLARISATION

Publication

EP 1057224 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99962260 A

Priority

  • DE 19860121 A
  • EP 9910017 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19860121A1] The invention relates to a dual-polarized dipole antenna which consists of several separate dipoles. Said dipoles are preferably arranged in front of a reflector (33) and form a dipole square when viewed from above, whereby each dipole (111-114) is supplied with current via a symmetrical line (115-118). The invention is characterized by the following features: The dual-polarized dipole antenna transmits electrical radiation in a polarization at an angle of +45 DEG or -45 DEG in relation to the constructively predetermined alignment of the dipoles (111-114); the ends of the symmetrical or approximately symmetrical lines which lead to the respective dipole halves (111a to 114b) are interconnected in such a manner that the corresponding line halves (115a to 118b) of the adjacent dipole halves (114b and 111a; 111b and 112a; 112b and 113a; 113b and 114a) which are vertical in relation to one another are electrically connected; and the supply of electric power to the diametrically opposite dipole halves results for a first polarization and decouples a second polarization which is orthogonal thereto.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 21/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/24 (2006.01); H01Q 9/16 (2006.01); H01Q 19/10 (2006.01); H01Q 21/06 (2006.01); H01Q 21/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 21/062 (2013.01); H01Q 1/246 (2013.01); H01Q 19/10 (2013.01); H01Q 21/24 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0039894A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19860121 A1 20000713; AT 252771 T 20031115; AU 1864700 A 20000731; AU 755256 B2 20021205; BR 9908179 A 20001024; CA 2322029 A1 20000706; CA 2322029 C 20030708; CN 1231999 C 20051214; CN 1291365 A 20010411; EP 1057224 A1 20001206; EP 1057224 B1 20031022; ES 2207313 T3 20040516; HK 1035441 A1 20060421; JP 2002534826 A 20021015; JP 3853596 B2 20061206; NZ 506123 A 20030829; US 6313809 B1 20011106; WO 0039894 A1 20000706

INPADOC legal status


2012-05-29 [REG SE ECNC] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS BEEN CANCELLED

2012-05-15 [REG AT MA03] REVOCATION OF THE PATENT

- Document: AT 252771 T

- Effective date: 20111107

2012-05-03 [REG DE R107] PUBLICATION OF GRANT OF EUROPEAN PATENT RESCINDED

- Document: DE 59907449

- Effective date: 20120503

2012-03-14 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20111107

2012-03-14 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Effective date: 20111107

2012-01-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20111219

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-01-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20111219

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120103

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20111220

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-11-07 [REG DE R064] EPO'S REVOCATION DECISION NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 59907449

2011-11-07 [REG DE R103] PATENT REVOKED BY EPO

- Document: DE 59907449

2011-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101231

2011-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101231

2011-07-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110218

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20101230

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101221

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-01-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20101220

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20091222

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-07-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: SCHMAUDER & PARTNER AG PATENT- UND MARKENANWAELTE VSP;ZWAENGIWEG 7;8038 ZUERICH (CH)

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040322

2004-09-15 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: ARIALCOM

- Effective date: 20040721

2004-07-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *KATHREIN-WERKE K.G.

- Effective date: 20031231

2004-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2207313 T3

2004-04-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-02-03 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-01-22 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040122

2004-01-22 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040122

2003-12-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031231

2003-12-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031231

2003-12-16 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031216

2003-12-16 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031216

2003-12-16 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031216

2003-11-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ROTTMANN, ZIMMERMANN + PARTNER AG

2003-11-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59907449 P 20031127

2003-11-26 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-11-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031022

2003-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-10-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-10-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-10-22 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031022

2002-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020315

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000720

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE