Global Patent Index - EP 1057228 A1

EP 1057228 A1 2000-12-06 - ELECTRICAL CONNECTOR CONTACT PIN

Title (en)

ELECTRICAL CONNECTOR CONTACT PIN

Title (de)

KONTAKTBUCHSE EINES ELEKTRISCHEN STECKVERBINDERS

Title (fr)

BROCHE DE CONTACT D'UN CONNECTEUR ELECTRIQUE

Publication

EP 1057228 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99904934 A

Priority

  • FR 9900401 W
  • FR 9802185 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2775389A1] The connection element is crimped on to the terminal at one end, whilst forming a resilient contact at the second end. The electrical connector comprises a body (2) and a connection element (3) surrounded by a sleeve (4). The connection element is held on the extension of the body (2) by being coupled to a peg (8) which projects from the front surface of the body. The sleeve is placed around the connection element and is arranged to grip an annular portion. The connection element has one section which is configured to fit over the pin, and at the other end has elastic fingers (12) which form a socket for connection to an external terminal pin. The open mouth defined by the elastic fingers lies just inside the aperture at the remote end of the outer sleeve (4).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/187

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/11 (2006.01); H01R 43/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/11 (2013.01); H01R 43/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9944261A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH FR LI

EPO simple patent family

FR 2775389 A1 19990827; FR 2775389 B1 20000505; EP 1057228 A1 20001206; EP 1057228 B1 20030528; US 6475039 B1 20021105; WO 9944261 A1 19990902

INPADOC legal status


2013-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120229

2012-11-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20121031

2012-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120229

2012-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120229

2012-09-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2011-05-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110125

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110311

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-05-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040302

2003-05-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-05-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH FR LI

2002-08-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020627

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000824

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH FR LI