Global Patent Index - EP 1057286 A1

EP 1057286 A1 2000-12-06 - METHOD FOR MANAGING COMMUNICATION MODES FOR AN AIRCRAFT

Title (en)

METHOD FOR MANAGING COMMUNICATION MODES FOR AN AIRCRAFT

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR VERWALTUNG KOMMUNIKATIONSMODEN FÜR EIN FLUGZEUG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE GESTION DE MODES DE COMMUNICATION POUR UN AERONEF

Publication

EP 1057286 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99958335 A

Priority

  • FR 9903150 W
  • FR 9816024 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2787658A1] The communications processing technique manages communications between the ground and an aircraft using digital exchanges. Two satellite communications modes (300,310) are available from ground stations (10-13,20,21). The man-machine interface (31) is served by a calculator (30) determining the choice of transmission automatically, taking account of costs and the zone flown over. Essentially generating and updating the data base of costs, performance, security/dependability and aircraft configuration.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04B 7/185

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B64D 45/00 (2006.01); H04B 7/185 (2006.01); H04B 7/26 (2006.01); H04L 12/28 (2006.01); H04L 29/04 (2006.01); H04W 84/06 (2009.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04B 7/18506 (2013.01); H04B 7/18508 (2013.01); H04W 84/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0038352A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR GB

EPO simple patent family

FR 2787658 A1 20000623; FR 2787658 B1 20010316; AU 1571100 A 20000712; CA 2320870 A1 20000629; EP 1057286 A1 20001206; JP 2002533988 A 20021008; RU 2000124082 A 20020810; US 6353779 B1 20020305; WO 0038352 A1 20000629

INPADOC legal status


2008-12-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080701

2005-03-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050204

2004-06-17 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): FR GB

2001-05-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THALES AVIONICS S.A.

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000810

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE