Global Patent Index - EP 1057292 A1

EP 1057292 A1 2000-12-06 - A FAST FREQUENCY TRANSFORMATION TECHIQUE FOR TRANSFORM AUDIO CODERS

Title (en)

A FAST FREQUENCY TRANSFORMATION TECHIQUE FOR TRANSFORM AUDIO CODERS

Title (de)

SCHNELLE FREQUENZTRANSFORMATIONSTECHNIK FÜR TRANSFORM AUDIO KODER

Title (fr)

TECHNIQUE RAPIDE DE TRANSFORMATION DE FREQUENCES DESTINEE A DES CODEURS AUDIO A TRANSFORMEE

Publication

EP 1057292 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98909964 A

Priority

SG 9800014 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9943110A1] A method for coding digital audio data in which coded Fast Modified Discrete Cosine Transform (FMDCT) coefficients are computed utilising a Fast Fourier Transform (FFT) method. The described method allows a significant reduction in computations as compared to an ordinary DCT coding procedure. Also, pairs of audio channels can be combined to use a single FFT computation, where the selected transform length for the paired channels is the same. In such cases where pairing of identical transform length channels is not possible, a long transform length channel is combined with a short transform length channel and converted in two short transforms. A windowing function is also combined with a pre-processing stage to the transformation, further decreasing computational requireements.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04H 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04H 20/89 (2008.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

H04H 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04H 20/89 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9943110A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9943110 A1 19990826; DE 69823557 D1 20040603; DE 69823557 T2 20050203; EP 1057292 A1 20001206; EP 1057292 B1 20040428

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090221

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090302

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090221

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090901

2009-11-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091030

2009-10-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090221

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080228

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080208

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080129

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080213

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-04-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-06-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69823557 P 20040603

2004-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-04-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-04-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030305

2001-12-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: STMICROELECTRONICS ASIA PACIFIC PTE LTD.

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000920

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT