Global Patent Index - EP 1057294 A1

EP 1057294 A1 2000-12-06 - CDMA DISPATCH SYSTEM

Title (en)

CDMA DISPATCH SYSTEM

Title (de)

CDMA GRUPPENANRUFSYSTEM

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE REPARTITION AMDC

Publication

EP 1057294 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98938208 A

Priority

  • US 9815954 W
  • US 95932797 A
  • US 95915297 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9922478A1] A quality dispatch service on a CDMA based wireless system (50). To achieve spectral efficiency and fast access for follow-up calls, in response to a request by a talkgroup member (A-D) to have a group call established, the non-requesting (listening-only) members (B-D) are allowed to establish a low-rate (non-voice) signaling link (54-56) in the reverse direction (inbound) for the limited purpose of (i) providing forward power control information to the fixed infrastructure; (ii) requesting soft hand-off when required; and (iii) maintaining the correct reverse link power control to allow for fast channel access for a follow-on call.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04J 13/00; H04B 7/185; H04B 7/19; H04J 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04J 13/00 (2006.01); H04B 7/216 (2006.01); H04B 7/26 (2006.01); H04W 84/08 (2009.01); H04W 4/06 (2009.01); H04W 4/14 (2009.01); H04W 72/04 (2009.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04W 84/08 (2013.01); H04B 7/264 (2013.01); H04W 4/06 (2013.01); H04W 4/14 (2013.01); H04W 72/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9922478 A1 19990506; AU 8678798 A 19990517; BR 9813326 A 20000822; DE 69834744 D1 20060706; DE 69834744 T2 20061019; EP 1057294 A1 20001206; EP 1057294 A4 20030205; EP 1057294 B1 20060531; JP 2001522164 A 20011113; JP 4820936 B2 20111124; KR 20010031579 A 20010416

INPADOC legal status


2011-05-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100731

2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090801

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100202

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-04-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100331

2010-03-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090731

2009-08-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20090624

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-02-27 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20080708

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080616

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080707

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080718

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080731

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-05-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070301

2007-01-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-09-12 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2006-07-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69834744 P 20060706

2006-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB IT SE

2006-05-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-11-09 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB IT SE

2004-11-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041008

2004-04-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010606

2003-02-05 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20021227

2003-02-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04J 13/00 A

2003-02-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04J 3/02 B

2003-02-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04B 7/185 B

2003-02-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04B 7/19 B

2003-02-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04Q 7/28 B

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB IT SE