Global Patent Index - EP 1057347 A1

EP 1057347 A1 2000-12-06 - DEVICE FOR THE PROJECTION OF A VIDEO IMAGE

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR THE PROJECTION OF A VIDEO IMAGE

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG FÜR DIE PROJEKTION EINES VIDEOBILDES

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR PROJETER UNE IMAGE VIDEO

Publication

EP 1057347 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99959386 A

Priority

  • DE 19860017 A
  • EP 9909617 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19860017A1] The invention relates to a device which is especially embodied as a projector head (60). Said device comprises a line mirror (12) which has at least one mirror surface (14) for deflecting the bundle of light in the line direction of the video image and an image mirror (16) for deflecting in the direction of the image. The normal to the surface (23) of the at least one mirror surface (14) is inclined under the angle epsilon in relation to the axis of rotation (33) of the line mirror (12). According to the invention, the bundle of lights (5) is incident to the surface mirror (14) under the angle (I), with epsilon ' = epsilon +/- 4 DEG to the normal to the surface, in the position of the line mirror (12) in which the bundle of lights (5) is directed to the centre of the video image in the main projection direction (28).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04N 9/31; G02B 26/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G02B 26/10 (2006.01); G02B 26/12 (2006.01); G02B 27/18 (2006.01); G03B 21/00 (2006.01); G03B 21/14 (2006.01); G03B 21/28 (2006.01); H04N 5/74 (2006.01); H04N 9/31 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G02B 26/12 (2013.01); H04N 9/3129 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0040035A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19860017 A1 20000629; AU 1657500 A 20000731; EP 1057347 A1 20001206; JP 2002534704 A 20021015; WO 0040035 A1 20000706

INPADOC legal status


2005-01-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040701

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI NL

2003-11-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: JENOPTIK LDT GMBH

2001-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHNEIDER LASER TECHNOLOGIES AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000704

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE