Global patent index - EP 1057352 A1

EP 1057352 A1 2000-12-06 - METHOD FOR TRANSMISSION OF SHORT MESSAGES IN A MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM

Title (en)

METHOD FOR TRANSMISSION OF SHORT MESSAGES IN A MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG VON KURZNACHRICHTEN IN EINEM MOBILEN TELEKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE TRANSMISSION DE MESSAGES COURTS DANS UN RESEAU DE TELECOMMUNICATIONS MOBILES

Publication

EP 1057352 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99906666 A

Priority

  • SE 9900197 W
  • SE 9800455 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9941922A1] The invention relates to a method in a digital mobile telephone system which makes possible broadcast-transmission of Short Voice Messages, SVM, over a packet switched carrier, for instance GPRS. The invention is characterised in that a short voice message can be transmitted to one or more receivers, and that the carrier which is utilised at the transmission is GPRS. Further, the voice message is speech encoded, and is transmitted over GPRS, at which the voice message is decoded and played out directly in the mobile terminal, or in one with the mobile terminal co-operating application.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04Q 7/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04W 4/12 (2009.01); H04W 4/06 (2009.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04W 4/12 (2013.01); H04W 4/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9941922A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK ES FI FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9941922 A1 19990819; EE 03726 B1 20020415; EE 200000475 A 20011217; EP 1057352 A1 20001206; NO 20003715 A 20000817; NO 20003715 D0 20000720; NO 325728 B1 20080707; SE 513373 C2 20000904; SE 9800455 D0 19980217; SE 9800455 L 19990818

INPADOC legal status

2010-01-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20090811

2007-12-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TELIASONERA AB

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2005-05-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050406

2001-02-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: AYOUB, SOUHAD

2001-02-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: WINROTH, MATS, OLOF

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000918

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FI FR GB IT SE

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: LT PAYMENT 20000918;LV PAYMENT 20000918