Global patent index - EP 1057435 A1

EP 1057435 A1 2000-12-06 - Modular unit construction system

Title (en)

Modular unit construction system

Title (de)

Modulares Baukastensystem

Title (fr)

Système de construction modulaire

Publication

EP 1057435 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00810481 A

Priority

CH 105199 A

Abstract (en)

The modular construction system consists of elements or parts, some of which are base parts (B(1)), intermediate parts (Z1) and closure parts (A) all interfitting. At least one intermediate part is in the form of a transition part with two different diameters. The parts are preferably made of plastic, wood, glass, stoneware, earthenware and metal or a combination of them and plugged or screwed together.

Abstract (de)

Modulares Baukastensystem, bestehend aus Basisteilen B(i), aus Zwischenteilen Z(j) und aus Abschlussteilen A(k), durch welche in einer Kombination dieser Teile ein Gebrauchsgegenstand zusammenfügbar ist. Als Materialien für diese Teile sind vorzugsweise Kunststoff, oder Holz, Glas, Steingut, Ton, Metall und dergleichen vorgesehen. Verwendung findet das modularen Baukastensystem bei der Gestaltung von Gebrauchsgegenständen wie Vasen, Behälter, Kerzenständer, Windlichter, Lampen, Teller, Uhren, Dekorationen und Lautsprecher. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47G 7/06; A47G 19/02; A47G 19/23; F21V 35/00; G04B 45/00; H04R 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47G 7/06 (2006.01); A47G 19/02 (2006.01); A47G 19/23 (2006.01); F21V 3/00 (2006.01); G04B 37/14 (2006.01); H04R 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47G 19/23 (2013.01); A47G 7/06 (2013.01); A47G 19/02 (2013.01); F21V 3/00 (2013.01); G04B 37/1473 (2013.01); H04R 1/02 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1057435 A1 20001206; CH 694068 A5 20040715

INPADOC legal status

2003-12-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030617

2003-03-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030204

2001-08-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010530

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI