Global Patent Index - EP 1057436 A2

EP 1057436 A2 2000-12-06 - Mounting device for a lamellar blinds shield

Title (en)

Mounting device for a lamellar blinds shield

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Befestigen einer Blende für Lamellenstoren

Title (fr)

Dispositif de montage d'un cache pour stores à lamelles

Publication

EP 1057436 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00810419 A

Priority

CH 102799 A

Abstract (en)

The fixture comprises a C-shaped profiled rail (5) inside which a slide piece (6) is movably guided. A clamp (18). in the form of a spring which has an acute angled free end pre-tensioned against a slide surface, allows the slide piece to move in only one direction and blocks it in the opposite direction. The spring as a V-shaped plate spring has two free sides (20) the free ends of which rest on opposite-facing arms of the C-shaped profiled.

Abstract (de)

Die Vorrichtung umfasst eine C-Profilschiene (5), in welcher ein Schieber längs verschiebbar geführt ist. Am Schieber (6) ist eine V-förmige Feder (18) befestigt, deren freie Enden unter Vorspannung spitzwinkelig an den Schenkeln der C-Profilschiene anliegen. Dadurch ist der Schieber (6) nur in der einen Richtung verschiebbar und in der Gegenrichtung gesperrt. Die Vorrichtung ermöglicht eine einfache Montage der Blende und eine sichere und dauerhafte Befestigung. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47H 21/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/323 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/323 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1057436 A2 20001206; EP 1057436 A3 20030205; EP 1057436 B1 20070718; AT 367504 T 20070815; CH 693574 A5 20031015; DE 50014488 D1 20070830

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160419

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-06-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20080421

2007-11-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2007-08-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50014488

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2007-08-30

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2007-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2007-08-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAAD, BALASS, MENZL & PARTNER AG

2007-07-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI

2005-08-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050617

2003-10-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI

2003-07-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20030503

2003-02-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-02-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-02-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7E 06B 9/323 A

2003-02-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 47H 2/00 B

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI