Global patent index - EP 1057440 A2

EP 1057440 A2 2000-12-06 - Toothbrush holder

Title (en)

Toothbrush holder

Title (de)

Zahnbürstenhalter

Title (fr)

Support de brosse à dents

Publication

EP 1057440 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00110863 A

Priority

DE 19925362 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19925362C1] The toothbrush holder (1) has a holder (6) for the beaker (2) with a hook section (7). The hook section (7) has an upper hook extension (8) which grips over the upper edge of the beaker (2) and a lower beaker support. When the beaker (2) is in place on the support, a movement space (10) is free to allow the beaker (2) to be moved up and down. The upper hook extension has an opening (11) to take a toothbrush handle (4), with a clamp action on it through the overlap between the beaker edge and the opening. The beaker holder (6) has at least one limit stop for the tilting movement of the beaker (2).

Abstract (de)

Ein Zahnbürstenhalter (1) weist einen Zahnputzbecher (2) auf, der benachbart zu seinem oberem Rand eine Einstecköffnung (3) für den Zahnbürstengriff (4) hat, deren Begrenzungsrand den in Einsteckstellung befindlichen Zahnbürstengriff (4) übergreift. Der Zahnputzbecher (2) ist mit einer Becherhalterung (6) lösbar verbindbar, die ein etwa hakenförmiges Halteteil (7) hat, das mit einem Hakenfortsatz (8) den oberen Rand des Zahnputzbechers (2) im Bereich der der Einstecköffnung (3) hintergreift und an der Unterseite des Zahnputzbechers (2) eine Unterstützungsstelle (9) für den Zahnputzbecher (2) aufweist. Bei auf der Unterstützungsstelle (9) abgestelltem, in Ruhelage befindlichem Zahnputzbecher (2) ist oberhalb des Zahnputzbecherrands ein Bewegungsfreiraum (10) vorgesehen ist, in den der Zahnputzbecher (2) in eine Hubstellung anhebbar ist. Der Hakenfortsatz (8) hat eine innenseitig der Einstecköffnung (3) zugewandte Durchtrittsöffnung (11) für den Zahnbürstengriff (4), die zur Bildung einer Scherklemmverbindung für den Zahnbürstengriff (4) in Ruhelage einen Teil des freien Querschnitts der Einstecköffnung (3) überdeckt und in Hubstellung diesen für den Durchtritt des Zahnbürstengriffs (4) zumindest bereichsweise freigibt. Die Becherhalterung (6) hat wenigstens einen Kippanschlag (12) für den Zahnputzbecher (2). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47K 1/09

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47K 1/09 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47K 1/09 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

WO 9806312 A1 19980219 - POTSCHIES HEINZ [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19925362 C1 20001026; EP 1057440 A2 20001206; EP 1057440 A3 20010905

INPADOC legal status

2005-09-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050319

2002-05-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-05-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020301

2001-09-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI