Global Patent Index - EP 1057442 A2

EP 1057442 A2 2000-12-06 - Toilet seat with a device preventing lateral movement

Title (en)

Toilet seat with a device preventing lateral movement

Title (de)

WC-sitz mit seitlicher Verrutschsicherung

Title (fr)

Lunette de W.C. avec dispositif empêchant le déplacement latéral

Publication

EP 1057442 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00110401 A

Priority

DE 19924800 A

Abstract (en)

The underneath (2) of the seat and the securing element (3) which is fixed on same to prevent the seat from slipping sideways on the toilet are connected together secured against rotation. The securing element can only be fitted on the underneath of the seat in certain angular positions and in each of these positions is rotationally secured to the seat through a push-fit socket connection.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem WC-Sitz (1) mit mindestens einem das seitliche Verrutschen des WC-Sitzes (1) auf einem WC verhindernden Sicherungselement (3), das bezüglich einer Drehachse (11) in verschiedenen Winkelstellungen an der WC-Sitzunterseite (2) befestigbar ist und das mit einem Vorsprung (8) über die Auflagefläche (9) des WC-Sitzes (1) nach unten für eine seitliche Anlage an der Wand des WCs übersteht, stehen die WC-Sitzunterseite (2) und das an ihr befestigte Sicherungselement (3) miteinander in drehfestem Eingriff. So ist das an der WC-Sitzunterseite (2) befestigte Sicherungselement (3) in der gewünschten Winkelstellung dauerhaft fixiert. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47K 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47K 13/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47K 13/24 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19924800 A1 20001130; DE 19924800 C2 20010705; EP 1057442 A2 20001206; EP 1057442 A3 20020123

INPADOC legal status


2012-05-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20111201

2006-11-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041124

2005-01-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041124

2003-11-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HAMBERGER INDUSTRIEWERKE GMBH

2002-10-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-08-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020627

2002-01-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI