Global patent index - EP 1057463 A2

EP 1057463 A2 2000-12-06 - Disposable diaper

Title (en)

Disposable diaper

Title (de)

Wegwerfwindel

Title (fr)

Couche jetable

Publication

EP 1057463 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00304255 A

Priority

JP 14233599 A

Abstract (en)

A disposable diaper including a pair of elasticized gasket cuffs disposed in transversely opposite sides of the diaper, a pair of elasticized barrier cuffs disposed adjacent the gasket cuffs and a three-dimensional feces receiving section extending at least partially across a crotch region of the diaper wherein the feces receiving section is defined by a pair of elasticized first barrier flaps transversely opposite to and spaced from each other and a pair of elasticized second barrier flaps longitudinally opposed to and spaced each other and extending transversely between the first barrier flaps. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61F 13/15

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60C 1/00 (2006.01); A61F 5/44 (2006.01); A61F 13/15 (2006.01); A61F 13/49 (2006.01); A61F 13/494 (2006.01); A61F 13/511 (2006.01); C08K 5/3435 (2006.01); C08L 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61F 13/4942 (2013.01); A61F 13/495 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1057463 A2 20001206; EP 1057463 A3 20010328; EP 1057463 B1 20050727; AU 3537500 A 20001123; AU 760367 B2 20030515; BR 0001826 A 20010102; BR 0001826 B1 20081118; CA 2308895 A1 20001121; CA 2308895 C 20030708; CN 100512783 C 20090715; CN 1274571 A 20001129; DE 60021475 D1 20050901; DE 60021475 T2 20060420; ID 26056 A 20001123; JP 2000325394 A 20001128; JP 2000327844 A 20001128; JP 3527435 B2 20040517; JP 4375838 B2 20091202; SG 80097 A1 20010417; TW 435208 U 20010516; US 6383170 B1 20020507

INPADOC legal status

2015-05-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140602

2015-05-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140519

2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141202

2015-02-27 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141201

2015-02-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20150130

2015-02-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 60021475

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20141202

2015-02-24 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2015-01-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140520

2015-01-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20140519

2014-12-17 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20141201

2014-12-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 60021475

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130531

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-08-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130516

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130515

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-07-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130513

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130515

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-07-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060428

2006-05-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-11-01 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2005-09-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60021475

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-09-01

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-07-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL SE

2005-07-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2004-06-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: UNI-CHARM CORPORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-08-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030709

2001-12-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB NL SE

2001-10-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010905

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL SE

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI