Global Patent Index - EP 1057466 A2

EP 1057466 A2 2000-12-06 - Lying arrangements

Title (en)

Lying arrangements

Title (de)

Liegeanordnung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de couchage

Publication

EP 1057466 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00108106 A

Priority

  • DE 19925627 A
  • US 75782901 A

Abstract (en)

The recliner frame (16) is supported by a framework (18) and is joined to a base on which a mattress element is placed. The mattress (22) contains a recess (58) flush with a recess (56) in the base. A toilet arrangement (14) comprising a portable module (60) on which a toilet pan (70) is placed beneath the recesses. A tubular, vertical entry element (76) has parts at least fitting into the recesses in the mattress and base. The portable module has a wash basin (94) swivel-mounted on a vertical axle (92) with a sanitary fitting (96).

Abstract (de)

Eine Liegeanordnung (10) umfaßt eine Liegevorrichtung (12) mit einem Rahmen (16), einem Gestell (18), welches den Rahmen (16) trägt, und einer Unterlage (20), die mit dem Rahmen (16) verbunden ist. Auf der Unterlage (20) liegt ein Matratzenelement (22). Damit der Benutzer seine liegende Position zur Verrichtung eines Toilettenganges nicht verlassen muß und der Toilettengang möglichst bequem ist, wird erfindungsgemäß vorgeschlagen, eine Ausnehmung (58) in der Matratze (22) und eine Ausnehmung (56) in der Unterlage (20) im Bereich der Ausnehmung (58) der Matratze (22) vorzusehen. Ferner ist eine WC-Einrichtung (14) mit einem unterhalb der Ausnehmungen (56, 58) anordenbaren WC (70) und einem rohrförmigen und im wesentlichen vertikalen Einleitelement (76) vorhanden, welches zumindest bereichsweise in die Ausnehmungen (56, 58) in Matratze (22) und Unterlage (20) einbringbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61G 7/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61G 7/00 (2006.01); A61G 7/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61G 7/02 (2013.01); A61G 7/0005 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 4117277 C1 19921217

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1057466 A2 20001206; EP 1057466 A3 20020717; DE 19925627 A1 20001207; US 2002088056 A1 20020711

INPADOC legal status


2003-10-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030118

2003-05-15 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-04-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-07-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-04-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61G 7/02 A, 7A 61G 7/00 B

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI