Global patent index - EP 1057532 A1

EP 1057532 A1 2000-12-06 - Shredding or fibrillation method

Title (en)

Shredding or fibrillation method

Title (de)

Zerkleinerungs- oder Fibrillierungsverfahren

Title (fr)

Procédé de déchiquetage ou de fibrillation

Publication

EP 1057532 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00303980 A

Priority

GB 9910884 A

Abstract (en)

A method and apparatus for shredding or fibrillating sheet material, such as plastics film. The sheet material is drawn past a series of inter digitating fibrillating members and spacers which rotate. Each spacer (1) is generally elongate and has a concave arcuate portion (3) extending rearwardly from its acute angled leading end (2). The apparatus includes means for reducing the tension of the fibrillating members and/or spacers, once fibrillation has commenced to prevent clogging or jamming caused by the sheet material getting between a spacer and fibrillating member. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B02C 18/44; B02C 18/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B02C 18/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B02C 18/0007 (2013.01); B02C 18/148 (2013.01); B02C 2018/0069 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1057532 A1 20001206; GB 9910884 D0 19990707

INPADOC legal status

2002-07-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010607

2002-02-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-08-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-12-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: ZORAB, JAMES

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI