Global Patent Index - EP 1057555 A1

EP 1057555 A1 2000-12-06 - Device for introducing a filter element into a housing in the upper part of a mould adapted to receive molten metal

Title (en)

Device for introducing a filter element into a housing in the upper part of a mould adapted to receive molten metal

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Einbringen eines Filters am oberen Teil einer Giessform zur Aufnahme von Metallschmelze

Title (fr)

Machine pour introduire un filtre dans un logement à la partie supérieure d'un moule adapté à recevoir du métal en fusion

Publication

EP 1057555 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00401556 A

Priority

FR 9907010 A

Abstract (en)

A machine (4) for handling a filter (5) associated with a filter housing (6) arranged in the upper part of a mold (2) is made up of:- a) a feed mechanism (11) for feeding, to each mold (2), a filter (5) essentially above an opening (9) in a holding cavity (12); b) a guidance system (13) for guiding the filter (5) from the holding cavity (12) to the opening (9); and c) a pushing system (14) for pushing the filter (5) the length of the guidance system (13) from the holding cavity (12) to its position in place in the filter housing (6), this filter improving the quality of the molten metal and the subsequent casting.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22C 9/08; B22C 23/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22C 9/08 (2006.01); B22C 23/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22C 23/00 (2013.01); B22C 9/086 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] WO 9915290 A1 19990401 - KLEKOWICKI KRZYSZTOF [PL]
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 012, no. 045 (M - 667) 10 February 1988 (1988-02-10)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 013, no. 465 (M - 882) 20 October 1989 (1989-10-20)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1057555 A1 20001206; FR 2794388 A1 20001208; FR 2794388 B1 20010810

INPADOC legal status


2002-06-13 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-05-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010607

2001-08-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI