Global Patent Index - EP 1057561 A1

EP 1057561 A1 2000-12-06 - Casting chamber for a pressure die casting machine

Title (en)

Casting chamber for a pressure die casting machine

Title (de)

Giesskammer für eine Druckgiessmaschine

Title (fr)

Chambre de coulée pour machine de coulée sous pression

Publication

EP 1057561 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99810489 A

Priority

EP 99810489 A

Abstract (en)

A die casting machine casting chamber, having a replaceable liner sleeve (3) pressed onto the chamber housing (2), is new. A pressure die casting machine casting chamber has a replaceable inner liner sleeve (3) which extends along all or part of the casting chamber housing length to form a piston slide surface (4) and which is pressed onto the housing (2) by a pressing mechanism (8, 9).

Abstract (de)

Die Giesskammer für eine Druckgiessmaschine besteht aus einem Giesskammermantel (2), in welchen auf seiner ganzen Länge ein die Gleitfläche (4) für den Druckkolben aufweisender Innenmantel (3) eingesetzt ist. Damit die überschüssige Wärme im Innenmantel (3) gleichmässig verteilt und weiter in den Giesskammermantel (2) abgeführt wird, sind Kupferringe (13) in den Innenmantel (3) eingesetzt, wobei dieser mittels in einen konischen Keil (8) eingeschraubter Schrauben (9) an den Giesskammermantel (2) gepresst wird. Auf diese Weise kann die Warmverformung der Giesskammer erstmals in Grenzen gehalten werden, ohne dass eine Öl- oder Wasserkühleinrichtung benötigt wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 17/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 17/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 17/2023 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1057561 A1 20001206; EP 1057561 B1 20040915; CA 2305841 A1 20001204; CA 2305841 C 20081021; DE 59910520 D1 20041021; ES 2227994 T3 20050401; US 6425434 B1 20020730

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090604

2010-10-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090605

2010-08-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090605

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100101

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-03-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100226

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080523

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080529

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080527

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080526

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-09-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050616

2005-08-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2227994 T3

2004-10-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59910520 P 20041021

2004-09-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2003-09-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030812

2001-08-29 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2001-08-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY LI

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010209

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY LI

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI