Global patent index - EP 1057587 A2

EP 1057587 A2 2000-12-06 - Machine for working sheets of glass and similar

Title (en)

Machine for working sheets of glass and similar

Title (de)

Maschine zum Bearbeiten von Glasplatten und dergleichen

Title (fr)

Machine pour usiner des plaques de verre et similaire

Publication

EP 1057587 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99830349 A

Priority

IT BO980356 A

Abstract (en)

Machine (1) for working sheets of glass (2) equipped with a movable work head (6) mounted on a portal (5) which, in turn, is movable over a machine bed (3); the work head (6) consisting of a mobile trolley (12) on the portal (5), a tool-holder group (13) extending from the trolley (12) towards the bed (3) according to a reference axis (A), and an orientation device (14) interposed between the trolley (12) and the tool-holder group (13) to rotate the tool-holder group with respect to the aforementioned trolley (12) around a vertical axis (V) parallel to the reference axis (A), and to move the tool-holder group (13) with respect to the aforementioned trolley (12) in a direction (15) perpendicular to said vertical axis (V); the aforementioned tool-holder group (13) being subdivided into a support bracket (16) fixed to the orientation device (14), and a tool-holder yoke (17) mounted on a support bracket (16) and able to move around a rotation axis (B), perpendicular to a reference axis (A). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24B 9/10; B24B 41/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 7/00 (2006.01); B24B 9/10 (2006.01); B24B 27/00 (2006.01); B24B 41/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 7/005 (2013.01); B24B 9/10 (2013.01); B24B 27/0084 (2013.01); B24B 41/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1057587 A2 20001206; EP 1057587 A3 20030312; IT 1306259 B1 20010604; IT BO980356 A1 19991206

INPADOC legal status

2006-08-30 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20060301

2004-02-04 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI

2003-12-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES LI

2003-09-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20030715

2003-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-03-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI