Global Patent Index - EP 1057600 A2

EP 1057600 A2 2000-12-06 - Short piece feeder

Title (en)

Short piece feeder

Title (de)

Zuführvorrichtung für kurze Werkstücke

Title (fr)

Appareil d'alimentation de pièces courtes

Publication

EP 1057600 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00303962 A

Priority

GB 9912053 A

Abstract (en)

A short piece feeder (1) for use with a multi-axis wood moulding machine having a rotary cutting head (20) for machining a workpiece (30). The short piece feeder comprises a reciprocating member (2,3) having a block (4) mounted on one end. A dog (6) is pivotably mounted on the block (4) and engages with a trailing end (32) of the workpiece (30) when the trailing end (32) moves past and clears the dog (6). Detection of the trailing end (32) of the workpiece (30) causes the activation of the reciprocating member (2,3) to draw the workpiece (30) across the rotating cutting head (20) of the multi-axis wood moulding machine, until the workpiece (30) is engaged by the feed roll (22b) downstream of the rotary cutting head (20). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B27C 1/14; B27B 25/04; B27C 5/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B27B 25/04 (2006.01); B27C 1/12 (2006.01); B27C 5/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B27B 25/04 (2013.01); B27C 1/12 (2013.01); B27C 5/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1057600 A2 20001206; EP 1057600 A3 20010207; AU 3537400 A 20001130; GB 9912053 D0 19990721

INPADOC legal status


2002-09-05 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-07-31 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010808

2001-10-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-02-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 27C 1/14 A, 7B 27C 5/06 B, 7B 27B 25/04 B, 7B 27C 1/12 B

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI