Global Patent Index - EP 1057624 A1

EP 1057624 A1 2000-12-06 - Apparatus for coating sheet material and method of operating the same.

Title (en)

Apparatus for coating sheet material and method of operating the same.

Title (de)

Anlage zum Beschichten von flächigem Material und Verfahren zu ihrem Betrieb

Title (fr)

Appareil pour le revêtement du matériau en feuilles et son procédé de fonctionnement.

Publication

EP 1057624 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00810421 A

Priority

CH 101299 A

Abstract (en)

The coating device has a reciprocating carriage (7) with 2 alternate rakes (5a,5b), used during movement of the carriage in opposite directions, for pressing a coating material (4), e.g. a coating ink, through a coating screen (3) onto the surface of an underlying sheet (1). The raising and lowering of the rakes is effected via a control belt (9a,9b) used for movement of a guide carriage (11) with guide slots controlling the vertical movement of respective rake holders (6b) and driven by the drive belt (8a,8b) for reciprocation of the carriage. An Independent claim for an operating method for a sheet material coating device is also included.

Abstract (de)

Zur Vermeidung eines längeren Stillstandes eines Druckwerkwagens (7) während der Umsteuerung zweier Rakeln (5a, 5b) beim Richtungswechsel ist ein Umsteuerschlitten (11) mit zwei schrägen Schlitzen (12a, 12b), in die mit Rakelhalterungen (6b) verbundene Gleitbolzen (13a, 13b) eingreifen, unabhängig im Druckwerkwagen (7) verschiebbar. Der Druckwerkwagen (7) wird von einem geschlossenen, über Antriebsritzel (9a, 9b) laufenden, als Zahnriemen ausgebildeten Treibriemen gezogen mit einem Trum (10), mit dem ein Trum (16) eines den Umkehrschlitten (11) ziehenden, ebenfalls als Zahnriemen ausgebildeten Steuerriemens eingreift und gleichläuft. Der Steuerriemen läuft jedoch über verschiebbare Umlenkrollen (15a, 15b), was eine von der Bewegung des Druckwerkwagens (7) unabhängige Verschiebung des Umsteuerschlittens (11) im Druckwerkwagen (7) gestattet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 15/46; B41F 15/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 15/08 (2006.01); B41F 15/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 15/0818 (2013.01); B41F 15/085 (2013.01); B41F 15/46 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1057624 A1 20001206; EP 1057624 B1 20030917; AT 249927 T 20031015; DE 50003693 D1 20031023; ES 2207480 T3 20040601

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160524

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-05-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: IGW GMBH INDUSTRIE- & GEWERBEPARK WILER, CH

- Document: AT 249927 T

- Effective date: 20120402

2008-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070517

2008-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070517

2007-02-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061201

2006-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061201

2006-12-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061201

2006-06-21 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060621

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-01-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-05-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-12 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050512

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-05-03 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20050503

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-09-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040618

2004-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2207480 T3

2004-06-01 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20040601

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-10-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50003693 P 20031023

2003-10-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ZIMMERLI, WAGNER & PARTNER AG

2003-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-09-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES IT LI NL

2001-08-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE ES IT LI NL

2001-07-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010530

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES IT LI NL

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI