Global Patent Index - EP 1057627 A2

EP 1057627 A2 2000-12-06 - Printing and coating machines

Title (en)

Printing and coating machines

Title (de)

Druck- und Lackiermaschine

Title (fr)

Machine pour imprimer et vernir

Publication

EP 1057627 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00304715 A

Priority

GB 9912830 A

Abstract (en)

A printing or coating machine having a rotatable print cylinder (1) from which a print or coated image is transferred to a sheet (m) of material supported on an impression cylinder (2) or block. The sheet (m) is held in register with the print cylinder (1) by means of a register lay (18) and is gripped by grippers (19). The leading edge (9) of the print cylinder (1) has recesses (20, 21, 22) into which the register lay (18) and the grippers (19) pass during printing. The print cylinder (1) is preferably an offset litho cylinder with a blanket (23) having portions (24) deflected into the recesses (20, 21, 22), or alternatively cut around recesses (20, 21, 22). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 21/12; B41F 21/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 21/10 (2006.01); B41F 21/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 21/12 (2013.01); B41F 21/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1057627 A2 20001206; EP 1057627 A3 20020522; GB 9912830 D0 19990804

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040330

2003-02-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-01-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021120

2002-05-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI