Global Patent Index - EP 1057655 A2

EP 1057655 A2 2000-12-06 - Cards

Title (en)

Cards

Title (de)

Karten

Title (fr)

Cartes

Publication

EP 1057655 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00304616 A

Priority

  • GB 9912726 A
  • GB 9916796 A

Abstract (en)

A greetings or other card, is disclosed having first and second leaves 2 and 4 lying one over the other. The first leaf 2 id secured to a tab 10 by a peelable adhesive 14. The tab is formed integrally with the second leaf 4. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B42D 15/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B42D 15/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B42D 15/045 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1057655 A2 20001206; EP 1057655 A3 20010704

INPADOC legal status


2004-06-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031202

2002-03-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011130

2001-07-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI