Global Patent Index - EP 1057662 A8

EP 1057662 A8 2001-03-28 - Pneumatic tyre

Title (en)

Pneumatic tyre

Title (de)

Luftreifen

Title (fr)

Bandage pneumatique

Publication

EP 1057662 A8 (EN)

Application

EP 00304682 A

Priority

JP 14837099 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1057662A2] A pneumatic tyre comprises a tread rubber layer (2), a side rubber layer (V) and a wing rubber layer (12) interposed between the tread rubber layer (2) and the side rubber layer (V). The side rubber layer (V) comprising a radially outer black sidewall rubber (15), a radially inner black sidewall rubber (16) and a white sidewall rubber (14) therebetween. The surface of the wing rubber layer (12) consists of a part (12a) contacting with the carcass (6), a part (12b) contacting with the tread rubber layer (2) and a part (12c) contacting with the radially outer black sidewall rubber (15) and the white sidewall rubber (14). The surface of the radially outer black sidewall rubber (15) consists of a part (15c) extending form the tread edge (P1) to a point (P3) on the tyre outer surface, a part (15a) contacting with the wing rubber layer (12) and extending from the tread edge (P1) to a point (P2), and a part (15b) contacting with the white sidewall rubber (14) and extending from the point (P2) to the point (P3). The radially inner black sidewall rubber (16) extends radially inwardly from a point (P4) on the tyre outer surface radially inside the point (P3) while contacting with the axially outside of the white sidewall rubber (14). The white sidewall rubber (14) is provided between the point (P3) and the point (P4) with a protruding part (17) so that the thickness (DP) of the white sidewall rubber (14) in the protruding part (17) measured from the outer surface to cords of the carcass is not less than 4 mm. The thickness (DS) of the radially outer black sidewall rubber (15) having a maximum value of not less than 3 mm at the point (P2). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60C 13/00; B60C 11/01; B60C 13/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60C 1/00 (2006.01); B60C 11/00 (2006.01); B60C 13/00 (2006.01); B60C 13/04 (2006.01); B60C 15/06 (2006.01); C08L 21/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B60C 13/04 (2013.01); B60C 1/0025 (2013.01); B60C 13/003 (2013.01); B60C 2015/0614 (2013.01); B60C 2200/10 (2013.01); Y10S 152/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1057662 A2 20001206; EP 1057662 A3 20011121; EP 1057662 A8 20010328; EP 1057662 B1 20051102; DE 60023593 D1 20051208; DE 60023593 T2 20060720; JP 2000335212 A 20001205; JP 3382179 B2 20030304; US 6619355 B1 20030916

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150601

2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151201

2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150526

2016-02-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160129

2016-01-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150526

2015-12-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60023593

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140521

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-08-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140509

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140521

- Year of fee payment: 15

2006-10-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060803

2006-06-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-12-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60023593 P 20051208

2005-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2005-11-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-10-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SUMITOMO RUBBER INDUSTRIES LIMITED

2002-08-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2002-07-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020429

2001-11-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SUMITOMO RUBBER INDUSTRIES LIMITED

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI