Global Patent Index - EP 1057692 A2

EP 1057692 A2 2000-12-06 - Electric appliance

Title (en)

Electric appliance

Title (de)

Elektrisches Gerät

Title (fr)

Appareil électrique

Publication

EP 1057692 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00108681 A

Priority

DE 19920302 A

Abstract (en)

An electric device or appliance has a current consumption unit (1) which can be supplied with electric power from a basic generator (2), which is driven by a basic pressurised air-turbine (3) which is connected via a connection device (4,4') to a main pneumatic line (5) of railway rolling stock. A storage battery (6) with a charge state indication, is provided for the electric device, and the storage battery (6) is provided with a charge monitoring circuit (7) for monitoring the state of charge of the battery.

Abstract (de)

Ein elektrisches Gerät ist lösbar an einem Güterwaggon befestigbar. Es weist eine Stromverbrauchseinrichtung (1) auf, die von einem Grund-Generator (2) mit elektrischer Energie versorgbar ist, der von einer Grund-Druckluftturbine (3) antreibbar ist. Diese ist über eine Anschlußeinrichtung (4, 4') mit einem Kupplungsstück lösbar an eine Hauptluftleitung (5) eines Zuges anschließbar. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60Q 1/30; H02J 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61L 15/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61L 15/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19920302 A1 20001130; EP 1057692 A2 20001206; EP 1057692 A3 20010606

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-19 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031101

2002-02-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011119

2001-06-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 60Q 1/30 A, 7H 02J 7/00 B, 7H 02J 7/14 B, 7B 60T 17/00 B, 7F 15B 13/02 B

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI