Global Patent Index - EP 1057731 A1

EP 1057731 A1 2000-12-06 - Wipe-on label applicator for fruit or vegetables and associated methods

Title (en)

Wipe-on label applicator for fruit or vegetables and associated methods

Title (de)

Etikettiervorrichtung und Verfahren zum Etikettieren von Obst oder Gemüse

Title (fr)

Applicateur d'etiquette et procédé d'étiquetage des fruits ou des légumes

Publication

EP 1057731 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00303776 A

Priority

US 31122799 A

Abstract (en)

A labeler (10) includes a frame (12), a label cassette (14) connected to the frame (12) for dispensing a label strip (16) including a carrier (30) and a plurality of labels (32) adhered thereon, a conveyor (22) for advancing articles such as fruit or vegetables (24) along a predetermined path of travel, a label applicator arm (18) pivotally connected to the frame (12) adjacent the label cassette (14), and a label feeder (20) for advancing the label strip along the label applicator arm (18) to a free end thereof. The label applicator arm (18) pivotally extends outwardly from the label cassette (14) along the predetermined path of travel so that the free end of the label applicator arm (18) contacts the articles (24). The label applicator arm (18) includes a V-shaped notch in the free end thereof, and a resilient roller (41) adjacent the V-shaped notch for pressing separated labels (32) onto the articles (24). The V-shaped notch separates the labels (32) from the carrier (30) to be applied to the articles (24) as the carrier (30) passes through the V-shaped notch and is divided into two waste portions (30a, 30b). The discarded carrier portions (30a, 30b) are withdrawn by the label feeder (20). The label applicator arm (18) includes at least one spring (71) for biasing the label applicator arm toward the conveyor, and a damper (73) for damping movement thereof. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65C 9/18; B65C 9/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65C 9/18 (2006.01); B65C 9/30 (2006.01); B65C 9/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65C 9/1869 (2013.01); B65C 9/30 (2013.01); B65C 9/42 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1057731 A1 20001206; AR 023970 A1 20020904; AU 3530600 A 20001116; BR 0001733 A 20010102; CA 2307152 A1 20001113; IL 135824 D0 20010520; MX PA00004616 A 20020308; NZ 504226 A 20001222; ZA 200002157 B 20010111

INPADOC legal status


2004-06-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031120

2002-10-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FMC TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

2002-01-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-08-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010511

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI