Global Patent Index - EP 1057732 A1

EP 1057732 A1 2000-12-06 - Lyophilisation container for medical, biological and fine-chemical use

Title (en)

Lyophilisation container for medical, biological and fine-chemical use

Title (de)

Lyophilisierbehälter für medizinische, biologische und feinchemische Zwecke

Title (fr)

Récipient de lyophilisation pour usage médical, biologique et chimique

Publication

EP 1057732 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00110417 A

Priority

DE 19925766 A

Abstract (en)

A container comprising an internal diameter that tapers over its entire height, or over the lower section down to the base, is new. The base is indented (4) to a degree described by a ratio expressed as the percentage of the internal radius of the container represented by indentation height. The percentage exceeds 10%, or preferably 18%. A container comprising an internal diameter which has a conical taper. The relative container base taper is expressed as the difference of maximum and minimum casing radii to height of tapering and exceeds 5%, preferably 18%. The relative base indentation exceeds 25% of the inner base radius. It is less than 80%, preferably less than 50%. The radially-outer container base has a flattened annular region with inner to outer radius ratio of 40%-80%. The internal base indentation (4) is formed conically up to the casing (1). Its height is 11-150 mm, with a wall thickness at the casing of 0.2 mm to 3 mm. An Independent claim is also included for a polygonal variant.

Abstract (de)

Medizinische und feinchemische Substanzen kommen als flüssige und feste Präparate, im speziellen als gefriergetrocknete Produkte, in Behältern auf den Markt, wobei die Gefriertrocknung in situ in dem Behälter erfolgt. Die Erfindung sieht einen Behälter vor, mit einem dünnwandigen transparenten, zum Boden hin verjüngten Behältermantel (1), einem daran angeformten Ausflußteil, das mit einem üblichen Verschluß verschließbar ist, und einem Boden (3), der mit einem ausgeprägt tiefen zentrischen Einzug (4) versehen ist. Ein derartiger Behälter hat eine sehr geringe Bruchrate und ist auch nahezu vollständig entleerbar. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 1/02 (2006.01); A61J 1/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 1/0276 (2013.01); A61J 1/06 (2013.01); B65D 2231/005 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1057732 A1 20001206; DE 19925766 A1 20001207; DE 19925766 C2 20030528

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040907

2004-11-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHOTT AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2004-05-19 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: LYOPHILISATION CONTAINER FOR MEDICAL, BIOLOGICAL AND FINE-CHEMICAL USE

2003-10-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030910

2001-08-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE CH DE FR GB LI

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000516

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB LI

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI