Global Patent Index - EP 1057735 A1

EP 1057735 A1 2000-12-06 - Improved support for barrels

Title (en)

Improved support for barrels

Title (de)

Lagerbock für Fässer

Title (fr)

Support pour fûts

Publication

EP 1057735 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99500085 A

Priority

EP 99500085 A

Abstract (en)

This support is constructed from a platform which is rectangular and hollow (1) in whose vertices tubular elements (4) are established for coupling with pillars (5), with the peculiarity that it also incorporates a pair of intermediate pillars (5'), which define two location areas for the placement of each barrel (6) which is supported on the platform with the collaboration of rods (7) which stabilise said barrels. Complementarily on the bottom of the platform there are pivots established (8) which couple in the pillars (5) in the stacking of supports, but with these pivots (8) dephased respecting the pillars (5), which permits that in stacking the supports, the same are alternatively dephased and, more precisely, that the barrels (6) adopt a quincunx formation, determining optimum accessibility to each and every one of them, upon each barrel adopting an intermediate position respecting the two situated on the levels above and below it. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 19/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 19/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 19/385 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

ES 9801070 U 19980423

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1057735 A1 20001206; EP 1057735 B1 20030402; DE 69906495 D1 20030508; DE 69906495 T2 20040408; ES 2152200 T1 20010201; ES 2152200 T3 20031101; PT 1057735 E 20030731; ZA 200000993 B 20000516

INPADOC legal status


2014-03-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20090526

- Year of fee payment: 11

2012-09-28 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101207

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100527

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110705

2011-07-15 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110715

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101201

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100526

2011-02-28 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101126

2011-02-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110131

2010-12-07 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20101126

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090531

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090511

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090522

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090519

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-03-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040105

2003-11-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2152200 T3

2003-05-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69906495 P 20030508

2003-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT PT

2001-08-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR IT PT

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010131

2001-02-01 [REG ES BA2A] PROVISIONAL PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2152200 T1

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT PT

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI