Global Patent Index - EP 1057739 A2

EP 1057739 A2 2000-12-06 - Container cap with anti-slip flange

Title (en)

Container cap with anti-slip flange

Title (de)

Behälterkappe mit das Abrutschen verhindernden Flansch

Title (fr)

Capuchon de récipient avec colerette antidérapante

Publication

EP 1057739 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00108531 A

Priority

US 13101099 P

Abstract (en)

A cap for use with a pump spray container, the cap having a body with an internal passageway to receive a spray mechanism, and having a side wall surrounding the passageway, a flange extending outwardly from an exterior surface of the side wall of the cap, the cap extending outwardly for a distance sufficient to act as an abutting member for a finger of a user's hand. The cap correctly positions the fingers of the user and prevents slippage of the container within the hand of the user. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 47/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 11/00 (2006.01); B65D 23/10 (2006.01); B65D 47/00 (2006.01); B65D 47/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 11/3052 (2013.01); B65D 23/102 (2013.01); B65D 47/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1057739 A2 20001206; EP 1057739 A3 20010404; CA 2280311 A1 20001026

INPADOC legal status


2004-06-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031104

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-10-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010906

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 65D 83/16 A, 7B 65D 47/40 B, 7B 65D 23/06 B, 7B 65D 47/00 B

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI