Global Patent Index - EP 1057739 A3

EP 1057739 A3 2001-04-04 - Container cap with anti-slip flange

Title (en)

Container cap with anti-slip flange

Title (de)

Behälterkappe mit das Abrutschen verhindernden Flansch

Title (fr)

Capuchon de récipient avec colerette antidérapante

Publication

EP 1057739 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00108531 A

Priority

US 13101099 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1057739A2] A cap for use with a pump spray container, the cap having a body with an internal passageway to receive a spray mechanism, and having a side wall surrounding the passageway, a flange extending outwardly from an exterior surface of the side wall of the cap, the cap extending outwardly for a distance sufficient to act as an abutting member for a finger of a user's hand. The cap correctly positions the fingers of the user and prevents slippage of the container within the hand of the user. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 83/16; B65D 23/06; B65D 47/00; B65D 47/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 11/00 (2006.01); B65D 23/10 (2006.01); B65D 47/00 (2006.01); B65D 47/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 11/3052 (2013.01); B65D 23/102 (2013.01); B65D 47/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1057739 A2 20001206; EP 1057739 A3 20010404; CA 2280311 A1 20001026

INPADOC legal status


2004-06-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031104

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-10-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010906

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 65D 83/16 A, 7B 65D 47/40 B, 7B 65D 23/06 B, 7B 65D 47/00 B

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI