Global Patent Index - EP 1057744 A3

EP 1057744 A3 2001-02-07 - Child-resistant package for tablets

Title (en)

Child-resistant package for tablets

Title (de)

Kindersichere Verpackung für Tabletten

Title (fr)

Emballage pour tablettes avec sécurité pour enfants

Publication

EP 1057744 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99810482 A

Priority

EP 99810482 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1057744A2] A childproof packaging (10) for tablets, capsules and similar pharmaceutical items, comprising an intermediate element (16) covered with adhesive layers (30)/(32) where the adhesive layer (32) has a holding force less than adhesive layer (30), is new. A childproof packaging (10) for tablets, capsules and similar pharmaceutical items, comprising: (a) an intermediate element (16) with a cover layer (18) located above the blister packaging (12); (b) a cover foil (26) of the blister packaging is oriented towards the intermediate element; (c) closed surrounding packaging (10); and (d) an adhesive layer (32) has a holding force which is less than the holding force of the adhesive layer (30).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 75/36; B65D 75/32; B65D 75/58

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 83/04 (2006.01); A61J 1/03 (2006.01); B65D 75/32 (2006.01); B65D 75/34 (2006.01); B65D 75/36 (2006.01); B65D 75/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 75/5855 (2013.01); A61J 1/035 (2013.01); B65D 75/32 (2013.01); B65D 75/326 (2013.01); B65D 75/327 (2013.01); B65D 75/36 (2013.01); B65D 2215/04 (2013.01); B65D 2575/3218 (2013.01); Y10S 206/807 (2013.01); Y10S 206/813 (2013.01); Y10S 206/82 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1057744 A2 20001206; EP 1057744 A3 20010207; EP 1057744 B1 20030402; AU 4921700 A 20001228; AU 767805 B2 20031127; CA 2373280 A1 20001214; DE 59904849 D1 20030508; EP 1232959 A2 20020821; EP 1232959 A3 20020828; EP 1232959 B1 20040915; EP 1234780 A1 20020828; EP 1234781 A1 20020828; EP 1234781 B1 20040915; JP 2003501321 A 20030114; MX PA01012072 A 20030630; US 2004173497 A1 20040909; US 2005145531 A1 20050707; US 2005145532 A1 20050707; US 6793077 B1 20040921; US 6896139 B2 20050524; US 6964338 B2 20051115; US 6974031 B2 20051213; WO 0075039 A2 20001214; WO 0075039 A3 20010628

INPADOC legal status


2013-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120630

2013-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120630

2013-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-01-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2012-06-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110602

2012-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110630

2012-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120103

2012-04-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59904849

- Effective date: 20120103

2012-03-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120229

2012-02-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110602

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110602

2011-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110627

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-01-07 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2010-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100629

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100625

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100625

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-07-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100630

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-03-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040105

2004-01-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-11-26 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1057744E

2003-07-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-05-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59904849 P 20030508

2003-04-30 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-04-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2003-04-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: SI

2003-04-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-01-15 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2002-04-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020222

2001-11-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALCAN TECHNOLOGY & MANAGEMENT AG

2001-10-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-24 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 20010807

2001-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010807

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 65D 75/36 A, 7B 65D 75/58 B, 7B 65D 75/32 B

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI