Global Patent Index - EP 1057745 A1

EP 1057745 A1 2000-12-06 - Child resistant tablets package

Title (en)

Child resistant tablets package

Title (de)

Kindersichere Verpackung für Tabletten

Title (fr)

Emballage pour tablettes inviolable par les enfants

Publication

EP 1057745 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99810481 A

Priority

EP 99810481 A

Abstract (en)

A childproof packaging (120) for tablets, capsules and similar pharmaceutical items comprising an intermediate element (126) with a detachable first opening tag and a detachable second opening tag, where detachment of the opening tags exposes the cover foil (136), is new. A childproof packaging (120) for tablets, capsules and similar pharmaceutical items comprising: (a) an intermediate element (126) positioned between the blister packaging (122) and the bottom element; (b) a first opening tab that is detachable from the intermediate element along perforations; and (c) a second opening tab which is detachable from the first opening tag along perforations, so that the cover foil (136) becomes exposed when the first opening tab is detached from the intermediate element.

Abstract (de)

Bei einer kindersicheren und seniorenfreundlichen Verpackung für Tabletten, Kapseln und dgl. pharmazeutische Produkte ist eine Blisterverpackung (122) mit wenigstens einem mittels einer durchdrückbaren Deckelfolie (136) verschlossenen Napf (134) zur Aufnahme der Tabletten (130) in einer Umverpakkung (120) zwischen einem Bodenteil (124) und einem Abdeckteil (128) angeordnet, wobei zwischen Blisterverpackung (122) und Bodenteil (124) eine Zwischenteil (126) angeordnet ist. Im Zwischenteil (126) ist eine erste, vorzugsweise über eine erste Perforationslinie (144) mit dem Zwischenteil (126) lösbar verbundene erste Öffnungslasche (142) und innerhalb der ersten Öffnungslasche (142) eine vorzugsweise über eine zweite Perforationslinie (148) mit der ersten Öffnungslasche (142) lösbar verbundene zweite Öffnungslasche (146) angeordnet, wobei die zweite Öffnungslasche (146) nach dem Lösen der ersten Öffnungslasche (142) vom Zwischenteil (126) von der ersten Öffnungslasche (142) unter Freilegung der Deckelfolie (136) lösbar ist. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 75/52; B65D 75/34; B65D 75/38; B65D 75/58

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 83/04 (2006.01); A61J 1/03 (2006.01); B65D 75/32 (2006.01); B65D 75/34 (2006.01); B65D 75/36 (2006.01); B65D 75/38 (2006.01); B65D 75/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 75/5844 (2013.01); B65D 75/326 (2013.01); B65D 75/327 (2013.01); B65D 75/38 (2013.01); B65D 2215/04 (2013.01); B65D 2575/3218 (2013.01); B65D 2575/3227 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1057745 A1 20001206; EP 1057745 B1 20030326; AU 4921500 A 20001228; AU 755146 B2 20021205; CA 2375277 A1 20001214; DE 59904730 D1 20030430; JP 2003501322 A 20030114; MX PA01011939 A 20030904; US 6679382 B1 20040120; WO 0075040 A1 20001214

INPADOC legal status


2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100602

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100630

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110101

2011-04-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100630

2011-04-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100630

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100602

2011-03-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110228

2011-02-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100602

2011-01-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090627

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090629

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090625

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-10-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090625

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090617

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-03-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031230

2003-12-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-11-26 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1057745E

2003-05-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030507

2003-04-30 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-04-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59904730 P 20030430

2003-03-27 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-03-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2003-03-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: SI

2003-03-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-02-05 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2002-02-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020107

2001-11-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALCAN TECHNOLOGY & MANAGEMENT AG

2001-08-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IE IT LI SE

2001-08-22 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 20010606

2001-08-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010606

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IE IT LI SE

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI