Global patent index - EP 1057747 A2

EP 1057747 A2 2000-12-06 - Straw holding tool and storage case for it

Title (en)

Straw holding tool and storage case for it

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Halten eines Trinkhalms sowie zugehöriger Aufbewahrungsbehälter

Title (fr)

Dispositif de maintien d'une paille et son étui de stockage

Publication

EP 1057747 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00304605 A

Priority

  • JP 15402599 A
  • JP 2000008601 A

Abstract (en)

A straw holding tool (1) holds a straw (8) inserted into a vessel (10) so that an upper section of the straw projects from an opening of the vessel before a cap (16) is set on the opening of the vessel and the straw is pressed by an internal bottom surface of the cap and accommodated in the vessel when the cap is set thereon. The straw holding tool has a body (2) having an engagement section (6) for engaging in the opening of the vessel and a hole for insertion of a straw, a straw holding section (3) with a holding hole (12) for holding therein an inserted straw, and an elastic expandable connector (4) which connects the straw holding section to the body. The straw can be packaged together with the straw holding tool within a packing log. A storage case (30) for storing the straw and the straw holding tool is also described. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 77/28; A47G 21/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47G 21/18 (2006.01); B65D 77/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 77/283 (2013.01); A47G 21/18 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1057747 A2 20001206; EP 1057747 A3 20010207; KR 20010007121 A 20010126

INPADOC legal status

2002-09-19 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-08-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010808

2001-10-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SETO, SHINJI

2000-12-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: KATSUMASA, TAKAFUMI

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI