Global Patent Index - EP 1057748 A1

EP 1057748 A1 2000-12-06 - Container for foodstuffs with an inserted removable cup-shaped element

Title (en)

Container for foodstuffs with an inserted removable cup-shaped element

Title (de)

Lebensmittelbehälter mit einem in die Behälteröffnung herausnehmbar eingepassten becherförmigen Einsatz

Title (fr)

Récipient pour aliments comprenant un élément emboîtable, amovible et en forme de gobelet

Publication

EP 1057748 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99110101 A

Priority

EP 99110101 A

Abstract (en)

The container's (1) lid (16) is secured by an anti-tamper closure seal with tear-off strip. The container opening (8) contains a removable insert (7) for viscous, liquid, granular and or powdered ingredients and or at least one item of cutlery. The container's outer casing (5) has a peripheral ledge (4) at the top end (9) of the interior (2). A cover-plate (10) seals off the interior; the ledge also forms a surface on which the insert stands. Two opposite-facing grips (15) protrude away from the sealing plate (14).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Behälter (1) für Lebensmittel, dessen Verschlußdeckel (16) durch einen Originalitätsverschluß gesichert ist und in dem ein becherartiger Einsatz (7) zur Aufnahme von Ingredienzen vorgesehen ist. Um den becherartigen Einsatz (7) sicher und bequem ohne die Gefahr einer Verschmutzung in dem Behälter (1) absetzen bzw. aus diesem herausnehmen zu können, ist erfindungsgemäß der Behältermantel (5) am oberen Ende des Füllraumes (2) mit einer eingesenkten Stufe (4) versehen, die mit einer den Füllraum (2) abdeckenden Platine (10) abgesiegelt und zugleich Standfläche (4) für den Einsatz (7) ist. Dieser ist seinerseits durch eine Siegelplatine (14) verschlossen, an der Grifflaschen (15) vorgesehen sind, mittels der der Einsatz (7) bei geöffnetem Behälter (1) sicher auf der Standfläche (4) absetzbar bzw. von dieser abhebbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 81/32; B65D 51/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 43/02 (2006.01); B65D 51/20 (2006.01); B65D 51/28 (2006.01); B65D 81/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 81/3216 (2013.01); B65D 43/0212 (2013.01); B65D 51/20 (2013.01); B65D 51/28 (2013.01); B65D 2101/0015 (2013.01); B65D 2251/0018 (2013.01); B65D 2251/0081 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00296 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00509 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00537 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00555 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00629 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00685 (2013.01); B65D 2543/0074 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00796 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1057748 A1 20001206

INPADOC legal status


2003-07-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021203

2002-11-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021009

2001-08-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK FR GB IT LI NL SE

2001-08-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010531

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI