Global Patent Index - EP 1057763 A2

EP 1057763 A2 2000-12-06 - Method and device for stacking thin objects

Title (en)

Method and device for stacking thin objects

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Stapeln von dünnen Gegenständen

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour empiler des objets minces

Publication

EP 1057763 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00201484 A

Priority

BE 9900384 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention concerns a method for stacking thin objects, whereby the objects are fed in an overlapping manner with a preceding object lying partially on top of a following object, and are pushed one under the other against a stop (4), such that the stack is formed from bottom to top. At a distance from the stop (4) which is smaller than the distance between successive overlapping objects, an air line is created from under the stack being formed, such that the bottommost object is blown upward to make a following object go underneath it up against the stop (4). The invention also concerns a device for carrying out this method. This device contains means to create a vertical air line near the stop (4). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 29/18; B65H 29/24; B65H 29/66

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 29/18 (2006.01); B65H 29/24 (2006.01); B65H 29/66 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 29/246 (2013.01); B65H 29/18 (2013.01); B65H 29/66 (2013.01); B65H 2301/42122 (2013.01); B65H 2301/44322 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1057763 A2 20001206; EP 1057763 A3 20011004; BE 1012699 A6 20010206

INPADOC legal status


2003-06-25 [R18W] WITHDRAWAL (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20030429

2003-06-18 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030429

2002-06-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020228

2001-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI