Global Patent Index - EP 1057769 A1

EP 1057769 A1 2000-12-06 - ELEVATOR

Title (en)

ELEVATOR

Title (de)

AUFZUG

Title (fr)

ASCENSEUR

Publication

EP 1057769 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98961449 A

Priority

JP 9805778 W

Abstract (en)

In an elevator apparatus, a hoisting machine is provided at the bottom part of a hoistway. A straight line connecting a pair of car guide rails together passes the center of gravity of a car or the vicinity thereof when viewed from a vertical projection plane. A straight line connecting a pair of car suspension sheaves together diagonal with respect to the straight line between the car guide rails so as to intersect it at the center of gravity of the car or in the vicinity thereof. Thus, a maintenance area for the hoisting machine is provided on side of the straight line connecting the car suspension sheaves together. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 7/00; B66B 7/06; B66B 11/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 11/0045 (2013.01); B66B 11/008 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1057769 A1 20001206; EP 1057769 A4 20090408; EP 1057769 B1 20100210; CN 1091742 C 20021002; CN 1284044 A 20010214; DE 69841498 D1 20100325; WO 0037349 A1 20000629

INPADOC legal status


2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151215

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120102

2013-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120701

2012-09-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20120831

2012-07-11 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20120701

2011-03-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101216

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110104

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-01-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20101111

2010-04-28 [REG NL T3] TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2010-03-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69841498

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2010-03-25

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2010-02-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR NL

2009-04-08 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20090306

2006-05-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000731

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR NL