Global patent index - EP 1057771 A2

EP 1057771 A2 2000-12-06 - Positioning of a hoisting machine

Title (en)

Positioning of a hoisting machine

Title (de)

Stellung eines Hebezeuges

Title (fr)

Placement d'une machinerie de levage

Publication

EP 1057771 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00111059 A

Priority

  • JP 15593199 A
  • JP 21675799 A

Abstract (en)

ÄObjectÜ To provide an elevator system which includes a hoisting machine in a hoistway and which can be installed in a hoistway of a height suited to a height of the highest floor level in a building. ÄSolving MeansÜ The elevator system has a car 2 disposed so that it may move up and down in a hoistway, a counterweight 3 disposed so that it may move up and down in the hoistway, a main rope 12 that suspends the car 2 and the counterweight 3, and a hoisting machine 18 on which the main rope 12 is wound and which raises and lowers the car 2 and the counterweight 3 via the main rope 12, wherein the hoisting machine 18 is disposed aslant with respect to a horizontal direction in a top portion in a hoistway 1. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 7/00 (2006.01); B66B 11/00 (2006.01); B66B 11/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 11/00 (2013.01); B66B 11/0045 (2013.01); B66B 11/008 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1057771 A2 20001206; EP 1057771 A3 20010228; EP 1057771 B1 20050406; CN 1167601 C 20040922; CN 1276335 A 20001213; DE 60019193 D1 20050512; DE 60019193 T2 20060216; DE 60040490 D1 20081120; DE 60041208 D1 20090205; EP 1400478 A1 20040324; EP 1400478 B1 20081008; EP 1557391 A2 20050727; EP 1557391 A3 20060726; EP 1557391 B1 20130731; EP 1623948 A2 20060208; EP 1623948 A3 20060510; EP 1623948 B1 20081224; JP 2001048451 A 20010220; JP 4200603 B2 20081224; TW 553882 B 20030921

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160524

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-17 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R084

- Ref Document Number: 60019193

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2012-06-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110602

2012-05-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120101

2012-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110630

2012-03-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20120229

2012-02-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20110602

2012-01-11 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20120101

2010-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100602

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-10-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100616

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-07-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100709

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-03-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060110

2006-03-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2006-03-08 [REG GB 727H] SPECIFICATION AMENDED (SECT. 27/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 727H

2005-11-02 [REG GB 727A] APPLICATION FOR AMENDMENT OF SPECIFICATION NOW OPEN TO OPPOSITION (SECT. 27/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 727A

2005-10-26 [REG GB 727] APPLICATION MADE FOR AMENDMENT OF SPECIFICATION (SECT. 27/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 727

2005-05-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60019193

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-05-12

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-04-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2005-04-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-05-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030324

2001-11-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB NL

2001-06-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010412

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI