Global Patent Index - EP 1057771 A3

EP 1057771 A3 2001-02-28 - Positioning of a hoisting machine

Title (en)

Positioning of a hoisting machine

Title (de)

Stellung eines Hebezeuges

Title (fr)

Placement d'une machinerie de levage

Publication

EP 1057771 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00111059 A

Priority

  • JP 15593199 A
  • JP 21675799 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1057771A2] ÄObjectÜ To provide an elevator system which includes a hoisting machine in a hoistway and which can be installed in a hoistway of a height suited to a height of the highest floor level in a building. ÄSolving MeansÜ The elevator system has a car 2 disposed so that it may move up and down in a hoistway, a counterweight 3 disposed so that it may move up and down in the hoistway, a main rope 12 that suspends the car 2 and the counterweight 3, and a hoisting machine 18 on which the main rope 12 is wound and which raises and lowers the car 2 and the counterweight 3 via the main rope 12, wherein the hoisting machine 18 is disposed aslant with respect to a horizontal direction in a top portion in a hoistway 1. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 7/00 (2006.01); B66B 11/00 (2006.01); B66B 11/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 11/00 (2013.01); B66B 11/0045 (2013.01); B66B 11/008 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1057771 A2 20001206; EP 1057771 A3 20010228; EP 1057771 B1 20050406; CN 1167601 C 20040922; CN 1276335 A 20001213; DE 60019193 D1 20050512; DE 60019193 T2 20060216; DE 60040490 D1 20081120; DE 60041208 D1 20090205; EP 1400478 A1 20040324; EP 1400478 B1 20081008; EP 1557391 A2 20050727; EP 1557391 A3 20060726; EP 1557391 B1 20130731; EP 1623948 A2 20060208; EP 1623948 A3 20060510; EP 1623948 B1 20081224; JP 2001048451 A 20010220; JP 4200603 B2 20081224; TW 553882 B 20030921

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160524

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-17 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R084

- Ref Document Number: 60019193

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2012-06-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110602

2012-05-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120101

2012-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110630

2012-03-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20120229

2012-02-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20110602

2012-01-11 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20120101

2010-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100602

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-10-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100616

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-07-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100709

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-03-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060110

2006-03-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2006-03-08 [REG GB 727H] SPECIFICATION AMENDED (SECT. 27/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 727H

2005-11-02 [REG GB 727A] APPLICATION FOR AMENDMENT OF SPECIFICATION NOW OPEN TO OPPOSITION (SECT. 27/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 727A

2005-10-26 [REG GB 727] APPLICATION MADE FOR AMENDMENT OF SPECIFICATION (SECT. 27/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 727

2005-05-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60019193

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-05-12

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-04-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2005-04-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-05-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030324

2001-11-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB NL

2001-06-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010412

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI