Global patent index - EP 1057773 A2

EP 1057773 A2 2000-12-06 - Stair for escalator

Title (en)

Stair for escalator

Title (de)

Fahrtreppenstufe

Title (fr)

Marche pour escalier roulant

Publication

EP 1057773 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00110158 A

Priority

DE 29909808 U

Abstract (en)

The escalator tread frame is made of plastics with a front (16) edge strip (22) anchored to it. The strip can be made of a harder material, such as aluminum and can have fixings (26) to attach it.

Abstract (de)

Eine Fahrtreppenstufe weist eine Trittstufe mit Trittstufenrippen auf, und eine Setzstufe, die sich von der Vorderkante der Trittstufe nach unten erstreckt. Mindestens ein Randbereich der Trittstufe ist mit einem abgesetzten Randstreifen versehen, und die Fahrtreppenstufe besteht im wesentlichen aus einem Material geringerer Härte, wie z. B. Kunststoff. Der Randstreifen (22) ist insbesondere an der Vorderkante (16) der Trittstufe (12) verankert und besteht aus einem Material größerer Härte, insbesondere aus Leichtmetall. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 23/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 23/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 23/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 29909808 U1 19990923; CZ 20002074 A3 20010117; CZ 293940 B6 20040818; EP 1057773 A2 20001206; EP 1057773 A3 20020403

INPADOC legal status

2006-04-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20051001

2003-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE ES FR GB

2002-07-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020522

2002-04-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI