Global patent index - EP 1057778 A2

EP 1057778 A2 2000-12-06 - Hoisting winch

Title (en)

Hoisting winch

Title (de)

Hebewinde

Title (fr)

Treuil de levage

Publication

EP 1057778 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00201886 A

Priority

NL 1012187 A

Abstract (en)

Hoisting winch in which a cable or rope (5) is wound up in one layer onto two mutually parallel rolls (3,4) which have a smooth surface. During winding up, a displacer (16,17) pushes aside the cable or rope, which has been wound up before. The hoisting winch is preferably mounted into a housing, together with an electric motor (10) and a battery (16). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66D 1/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66D 1/38 (2006.01); B66D 1/74 (2006.01); B66D 3/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66D 1/38 (2013.01); B66D 1/7405 (2013.01); B66D 3/22 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1057778 A2 20001206; EP 1057778 A3 20030528; NL 1012187 C1 20001201

INPADOC legal status

2003-11-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20021203

2003-07-09 [32PN] PUBLIC NOTIFICATION UNDER RULE 80 EPC

- Ref Legal Event Code: 32PN

- Free Format Text: NOTING OF LOSS OF RIGHTS (R.69(1) EPC)

2003-05-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-05-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-05-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7B 66D 1/26 A

2003-05-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7B 66D 1/74 B

2003-05-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7B 66D 1/38 B

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI