Global patent index - EP 1057850 A2

EP 1057850 A2 2000-12-06 - LCP bonding method

Title (en)

LCP bonding method

Title (de)

Verbindungsverfahren von Flüssigkristall-Polymeren

Title (fr)

Procédé de soudage de polymères à cristaux liquides

Publication

EP 1057850 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00304557 A

Priority

JP 15387899 A

Abstract (en)

A method for bonding LCPs mutually or an LCP and another material comprising the step of bonding LCPs mutually or an LCP and another material using an adhesive prepared by adding a polycarbodiimide resin with an epoxy resin composition comprising an epoxy resin and a curing agent, thereby providing excellent adhesion and heat resistance.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C08J 5/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08J 5/12 (2006.01); C09J 5/00 (2006.01); C09J 163/00 (2006.01); C09J 179/00 (2006.01); C09J 179/08 (2006.01); H01L 21/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01L 24/29 (2013.01); C08J 5/128 (2013.01); C09J 163/00 (2013.01); C09J 179/08 (2013.01); H01L 24/83 (2013.01); H01L 2224/29 (2013.01); H01L 2224/29101 (2013.01); H01L 2224/2919 (2013.01); H01L 2224/2929 (2013.01); H01L 2224/29386 (2013.01); H01L 2224/29388 (2013.01); H01L 2224/29393 (2013.01); H01L 2224/8319 (2013.01); H01L 2224/8385 (2013.01); H01L 2924/00013 (2013.01); H01L 2924/01004 (2013.01); H01L 2924/01005 (2013.01); H01L 2924/01006 (2013.01); H01L 2924/01013 (2013.01); H01L 2924/01015 (2013.01); H01L 2924/0102 (2013.01); H01L 2924/01027 (2013.01); H01L 2924/01029 (2013.01); H01L 2924/01033 (2013.01); H01L 2924/01047 (2013.01); H01L 2924/01051 (2013.01); H01L 2924/01074 (2013.01); H01L 2924/014 (2013.01); H01L 2924/0665 (2013.01); H01L 2924/07802 (2013.01); H01L 2924/181 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. C09J 163/00 + C08L 2666/20
  2. C09J 179/08 + C08L 63/00
  3. H01L 2224/2919 + H01L 2924/0665
  4. H01L 2924/0665 + H01L 2924/00
  5. H01L 2224/29101 + H01L 2924/014 + H01L 2924/00
  6. H01L 2224/2929 + H01L 2924/0665 + H01L 2924/00014
  7. H01L 2224/29386 + H01L 2924/05442 + H01L 2924/00014
  8. H01L 2224/29386 + H01L 2924/05432 + H01L 2924/00014
  9. H01L 2224/29393 + H01L 2924/00014
  10. H01L 2224/29388 + H01L 2924/00014
  11. H01L 2924/00013 + H01L 2224/29099
  12. H01L 2924/00013 + H01L 2224/29199
  13. H01L 2924/00013 + H01L 2224/29299
  14. H01L 2924/00013 + H01L 2224/2929
  15. H01L 2924/181 + H01L 2924/00

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1057850 A2 20001206; EP 1057850 A3 20001220; JP 2000345132 A 20001212; US 6331226 B1 20011218

INPADOC legal status

2004-05-12 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20040224

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010316

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7C 08J 5/12 A, 7C 09J 179/00 B, 7C 09J 163/00 B, 7C 08L 67:00 Z

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI