Global Patent Index - EP 1057882 A1

EP 1057882 A1 2000-12-06 - Lubricating oil composition for cellulose base wet friction material

Title (en)

Lubricating oil composition for cellulose base wet friction material

Title (de)

Schmiermittelzusammensetzung für Nassreibungsmaterial auf Zellulosebasis

Title (fr)

Composition d'huile lubrifiante pour matériau de friction humide à base de cellulose

Publication

EP 1057882 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00111046 A

Priority

JP 15774299 A

Abstract (en)

There is disclosed a lubricating oil composition for cellulose base wet friction material which comprises a base oil blended with (A) a boron-containing imide base dispersant (e.g. boron treated polyalkenyl succinimide) having a weight-average molecular weight in the range of 500 to 3000 and having a ratio by weight of boron to nitrogen (B/N) in the range of 0.1 to 1.5 in such a blending amount that the boron content and the nitrogen content each derived from the component (A) are made to be at least 60 ppm by weight and at least 100 ppm by weight, respectively based on the base oil. The above lubricating oil composition enhances peeling resistant durability for a friction material, especially a cellulose base friction material without impairing the wear resistance or scoring resistance of a steel material element, and is well suited for use in a cellulose base friction material for a starting and running device and a transmission clutch that are used in an automatic transmission of an automobile.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10M 133/56; C10M 141/12; C10M 159/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10M 169/04 (2006.01); C10M 101/02 (2006.01); C10M 105/04 (2006.01); C10M 105/14 (2006.01); C10M 105/32 (2006.01); C10M 133/56 (2006.01); C10M 139/00 (2006.01); C10M 141/10 (2006.01); C10N 30/06 (2006.01); C10N 40/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10M 133/56 (2013.01); C10M 141/10 (2013.01); C10M 2207/024 (2013.01); C10M 2207/289 (2013.01); C10M 2215/04 (2013.01); C10M 2215/064 (2013.01); C10M 2215/086 (2013.01); C10M 2215/22 (2013.01); C10M 2215/221 (2013.01); C10M 2215/225 (2013.01); C10M 2215/226 (2013.01); C10M 2215/26 (2013.01); C10M 2215/28 (2013.01); C10M 2215/30 (2013.01); C10M 2217/046 (2013.01); C10M 2217/06 (2013.01); C10M 2219/022 (2013.01); C10M 2219/024 (2013.01); C10M 2219/066 (2013.01); C10M 2219/068 (2013.01); C10M 2219/082 (2013.01); C10M 2219/083 (2013.01); C10M 2219/084 (2013.01); C10M 2219/085 (2013.01); C10M 2223/02 (2013.01); C10M 2223/04 (2013.01); C10M 2223/042 (2013.01); C10M 2223/049 (2013.01); C10M 2223/10 (2013.01); C10M 2223/12 (2013.01); C10M 2225/04 (2013.01); C10M 2227/061 (2013.01); C10M 2229/041 (2013.01); C10N 2240/04 (2013.01); C10N 2240/042 (2013.01); C10N 2240/044 (2013.01); C10N 2240/046 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

C10M 141/10 + C10M 133/56 + C10M 135/04 + C10M 135/06 + C10M 135/18 + C10M 135/22 + C10M 135/24 + C10M 137/02

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1057882 A1 20001206; JP 2000345182 A 20001212; US 2002165102 A1 20021107

INPADOC legal status


2010-05-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20091201

2005-06-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050428

2001-08-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010514

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI