Global Patent Index - EP 1057883 A2

EP 1057883 A2 2000-12-06 - Gear lubricating oil composition

Title (en)

Gear lubricating oil composition

Title (de)

Schmierölzusammensetzung für Getriebe

Title (fr)

Composition d'huile lubrifiante pour engrenages

Publication

EP 1057883 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00304671 A

Priority

JP 15353099 A

Abstract (en)

A gear lubricating oil composition comprising a base oil of lubricating viscosity having dissolved or dispersed therein an alkali metal borate or a hydrate thereof in an amount of 0.04 to 1.0 wt % in terms of boron content, an oil-soluble sulfur-containing extreme pressure agent in an amount of 0.01 to 5.0 wt % in terms of sulfur content, an oil-soluble phosphorus-containing extreme pressure agent in an amount of 0.001 to 1.0 wt % in terms of phosphorus content, and a zinc dialkyldithiophosphate in an amount of 0.01 to 1.0 wt % in terms of phosphorus content.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10M 141/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10M 141/10 (2006.01); C10N 10/02 (2006.01); C10N 10/04 (2006.01); C10N 30/06 (2006.01); C10N 40/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10M 141/10 (2013.01); C10M 2201/087 (2013.01); C10M 2201/10 (2013.01); C10M 2201/102 (2013.01); C10M 2201/105 (2013.01); C10M 2219/022 (2013.01); C10M 2219/024 (2013.01); C10M 2223/02 (2013.01); C10M 2223/04 (2013.01); C10M 2223/041 (2013.01); C10M 2223/045 (2013.01); C10M 2223/049 (2013.01); C10M 2223/10 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

C10M 141/10 + C10M 125/26 + C10M 135/04 + C10M 135/06 + C10M 137/02 + C10M 137/04 + C10M 137/10

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1057883 A2 20001206; EP 1057883 A3 20010124; CA 2310352 A1 20001201; JP 2000336385 A 20001205; JP 4363701 B2 20091111; SG 89329 A1 20020618

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050621

2005-03-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050209

2001-10-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB NL

2001-09-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010716

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI