Global patent index - EP 1057883 A3

EP 1057883 A3 2001-01-24 - Gear lubricating oil composition

Title (en)

Gear lubricating oil composition

Title (de)

Schmierölzusammensetzung für Getriebe

Title (fr)

Composition d'huile lubrifiante pour engrenages

Publication

EP 1057883 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00304671 A

Priority

JP 15353099 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1057883A2] A gear lubricating oil composition comprising a base oil of lubricating viscosity having dissolved or dispersed therein an alkali metal borate or a hydrate thereof in an amount of 0.04 to 1.0 wt % in terms of boron content, an oil-soluble sulfur-containing extreme pressure agent in an amount of 0.01 to 5.0 wt % in terms of sulfur content, an oil-soluble phosphorus-containing extreme pressure agent in an amount of 0.001 to 1.0 wt % in terms of phosphorus content, and a zinc dialkyldithiophosphate in an amount of 0.01 to 1.0 wt % in terms of phosphorus content.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10M 141/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10M 141/10 (2006.01); C10N 10/02 (2006.01); C10N 10/04 (2006.01); C10N 30/06 (2006.01); C10N 40/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10M 141/10 (2013.01); C10M 2201/087 (2013.01); C10M 2201/10 (2013.01); C10M 2201/102 (2013.01); C10M 2201/105 (2013.01); C10M 2219/022 (2013.01); C10M 2219/024 (2013.01); C10M 2223/02 (2013.01); C10M 2223/04 (2013.01); C10M 2223/041 (2013.01); C10M 2223/045 (2013.01); C10M 2223/049 (2013.01); C10M 2223/10 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

C10M 141/10 + C10M 125/26 + C10M 135/04 + C10M 135/06 + C10M 137/02 + C10M 137/04 + C10M 137/10

Citation (search report)

  • [Y] US 4089790 A 19780516 - ADAMS JOHN HOWARD
  • [DY] US 4717490 A 19880105 - SALENTINE CHRISTOPHER G [US]
  • [XDY] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 199432, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class E19, AN 1994-260796, XP002154065
  • [DXY] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 199730, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class E11, AN 1997-328634, XP002154066

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1057883 A2 20001206; EP 1057883 A3 20010124; CA 2310352 A1 20001201; JP 2000336385 A 20001205; JP 4363701 B2 20091111; SG 89329 A1 20020618

INPADOC legal status

2005-12-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050621

2005-03-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050209

2001-10-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB NL

2001-09-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010716

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI