Global Patent Index - EP 1057900 A1

EP 1057900 A1 2000-12-06 - Cast cylinder head and block

Title (en)

Cast cylinder head and block

Title (de)

Zylinderkopf- und Motorblockgussteil

Title (fr)

Culasse et bloc cylindre moulé

Publication

EP 1057900 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00111448 A

Priority

DE 19925666 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19925666C1] A cast cylinder head and engine block component, made of an aluminum-silicon alloy containing aluminum-nickel, aluminum-copper, aluminum-manganese and aluminum-iron and their mixed phases, is new. A cast cylinder head and engine block component, consisting of an aluminum alloy of composition 6.80-7.20% Si, 0.35-0.45% Fe, 0.30-0.40% Cu, 0.25-0.30% Mn, 0.35-0.45% Mg, 0.45-0.55% Ni, 0.10-0.15% Zn, 0.11-0.15% Ti, \}0.05% each (\}0.15% total) impurities and balance Al, contains aluminum-nickel, aluminum-copper, aluminum-manganese and aluminum-iron phases and their mixed phases. An Independent claim is also included for production of the above cylinder head and engine block component by casting at 720-740 deg C, cooling at 0.1-10 K/sec. to room temperature, solution annealing at 530 deg C for 5 hr., quenching in water at 80 deg C and artificially aging at 160-200 deg C for 6 hr.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Zylinderkopf- und Motorblockgußteil aus Si 6,80 - 7,20, Fe 0,35 - 0,45, Cu 0,30 - 0,40, Mn 0,25 - 0,30, Mg 0,35 - 0,45, Ni 0,45 - 0,55, Zn 0,10 - 0,15, Ti 0,11 - 0,15, Rest Aluminium und Phasen vom Typ Aluminium-Nickel, Aluminium-Kupfer, Aluminium-Mangan, Aluminium-Eisen sowie Mischphasen. Zur Herstellung wird eine Aluminiumlegierung bei Temperaturen von 720 bis 740 °C in die Gußform eingegeben, die Aluminiumlegierung einer Abkühlung mit einer Abkühlgeschwindigkeit 0,1 - 10 K s<-1> unterzogen, nach der Abkühlung auf Raumtemperatur eine Wärmebehandlung unter folgenden Bedingungen durchgeführt: einem Lösungsglühen bei 530 °C für 5 Stunden, einem Abschrecken in Wasser bei 80 °C sowie einem Warmauslagern bei einer Temperatur von 160 bis 200 °C für 6 Stunden.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 21/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22C 21/02 (2006.01); C22F 1/043 (2006.01); F02F 1/00 (2006.01); F02F 1/24 (2006.01); F02F 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22F 1/043 (2013.01); C22C 21/02 (2013.01); F02F 1/24 (2013.01); F02F 7/0085 (2013.01); F05C 2201/021 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[A] W.HUFNAGEL: "Aluminium-Taschenbuch 14 Auflage, Seiten 872 bis 877", 1986, ALUMINIUM VERLAG, DUSSELDORF, DE, XP002146538

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19925666 C1 20000928; AT 204026 T 20010815; CA 2310351 A1 20001204; CA 2310351 C 20040203; CZ 20002066 A3 20011114; CZ 293797 B6 20040818; EP 1057900 A1 20001206; EP 1057900 B1 20010808; ES 2163386 T3 20020201; MX PA00005392 A 20020604; PL 193871 B1 20070330; PL 340325 A1 20001218; US 2002053373 A1 20020509; US 6511555 B2 20030128

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080527

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121201

2013-03-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50000009

- Effective date: 20121201

2011-09-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110517

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090527

2010-10-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090528

2010-07-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090528

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090527

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090602

2010-02-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100129

2010-01-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090527

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080521

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080521

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080527

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080523

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-01-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-01-07 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2003-05-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030528

2003-05-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030527

2002-07-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020531

2002-05-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020531

2002-05-27 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020527

2002-05-27 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020527

2002-05-13 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20020513

- Year of fee payment: 3

2002-05-10 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20020510

- Year of fee payment: 3

2002-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2163386 T3

2002-01-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011108

2001-11-09 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011109

2001-11-08 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011108

2001-11-08 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011108

2001-09-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50000009 20010913

2001-09-05 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2001-08-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-08-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-08-08 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010808

2001-08-08 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010808

2001-08-08 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010808

2001-08-08 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010808

2001-08-08 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010808

2001-08-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 204026 T 20010815

2001-04-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010226

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000930

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI