Global Patent Index - EP 1057901 A2

EP 1057901 A2 2000-12-06 - Fast moving part of a plastic working apparatus

Title (en)

Fast moving part of a plastic working apparatus

Title (de)

Schnelllaufendes Teil für eine Maschine zur plastischen Verformung

Title (fr)

Elément à mouvement rapide pour une machine de façonnage plastique

Publication

EP 1057901 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00111267 A

Priority

  • JP 15598999 A
  • JP 2000108499 A

Abstract (en)

A fast moving part for a plastic working apparatus, such as a press. It is formed from a composite containing, e.g., aluminum as a light metal matrix. The composite contains 10% to 45% by volume of a ceramic material and 0.1% to 1.0% by weight of free-cutting inclusions.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 32/00; B30B 15/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B30B 15/06 (2006.01); C22C 32/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 32/0036 (2013.01); C22C 32/0089 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1057901 A2 20001206; EP 1057901 A3 20020206; JP 2001047298 A 20010220; US 2001002240 A1 20010531

INPADOC legal status


2004-06-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031202

2003-11-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031006

2002-10-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE LI

2002-05-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020308

2002-02-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-02-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-01-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 22C 32/00 A, 7B 30B 15/06 B, 7B 29C 43/32 B, 7C 22C 21/00 B

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE LI

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI