Global Patent Index - EP 1057906 A1

EP 1057906 A1 2000-12-06 - Web producing installation and method

Title (en)

Web producing installation and method

Title (de)

Vliesanlage und Betriebsverfahren

Title (fr)

Installation et procédé de production de voile

Publication

EP 1057906 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00111172 A

Priority

DE 29909016 U

Abstract (en)

The assembly to lay a carded web has a monitor (13) after the outlet (19) from the web layer (4), to measure the density of the web (10), and to set the action of the profiling unit (20). Preferred Features: The monitor (13) is linked to the profiling unit (20) by a control circuit (21). The monitor (13) has a continuous or intermittent operation, and is behind the web bonding station (12). The monitor (13) has an optical or radiometric operation. The web layer (4) has two recirculating laying belts, and two main trolleys (8,9) with separate controls and drives. The profiling unit (20) has a freely-programmable control (5) to generate profiling speed differences between the belt speed and the main trolley speed. The web layer (4) has at least one auxiliary trolley for the tension of at least one laying belt.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Betriebsverfahren und eine Vliesanlage (1) mit mindestens einem Vliesleger (4), der einen von einer Krempel (2) kommenden Flor (3) in ein mehrlagiges Vlies (10) umfaltet. Hierbei wird mit einer Profilbildungseinrichtung (20) das Vlies (10) im Querschnitt profiliert und nachfolgend an mindestens eine Verfestigungseinrichtung (12), insbesondere eine Nadelmaschine, abgeführt. Hinter dem Auslass (19) des Vlieslegers (4) wird mit einer Messeinrichtung (13) die Dichte und das Profil des Vlieses (10) bestimmt. Die Profilbildungseinrichtung (20) wird dann entsprechend dieser Messwerte zur Erzeugung des gewünschten Vliesprofiles eingestellt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01G 25/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01G 23/06 (2006.01); D01G 25/00 (2006.01); D04H 1/46 (2012.01); D04H 1/74 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01G 25/00 (2013.01); D01G 23/06 (2013.01); D04H 1/46 (2013.01); D04H 1/74 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29909016 U1 20001005; EP 1057906 A1 20001206; EP 1057906 B1 20030423; ES 2197036 T3 20040101

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160524

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160524

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160523

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160616

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150521

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110525

2013-10-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20131029

2012-08-23 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: AUTEFA SOLUTIONS GERMANY GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: AUTEFA AUTOMATION GMBH, 86316 FRIEDBERG, DE

- Document: DE 50001834

- Effective date: 20120704

2012-08-23 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50001834

- Representative's name: ERNICKE & ERNICKE, DE

- Effective date: 20120704

2012-07-04 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50001834

- Representative's name: ERNICKE & ERNICKE, DE

2012-03-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *AUTEFA AUTOMATION G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20110531

2010-10-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20100527

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-07-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20100527

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-04-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040126

2004-02-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-01-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2197036 T3

2003-08-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030729

2003-05-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50001834 P 20030528

2003-04-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

2003-04-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-05-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020326

2001-08-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE ES FR GB IT

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010209

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI