Global Patent Index - EP 1057908 A1

EP 1057908 A1 2000-12-06 - Moving cleaner for textile manufacturing machines

Title (en)

Moving cleaner for textile manufacturing machines

Title (de)

Wanderreiniger für textile Fertigungsanlagen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de nettoyage mobile pour des machines de fabrication de textiles

Publication

EP 1057908 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99110352 A

Priority

EP 99110352 A

Abstract (en)

The invention relates to a travelling cleaner (12) for textile finishing installations whose carriage comprises a chassis (18) which is supported on three idler wheels (1, 2, 3). The idler wheels (1, 2, 3) are suspended in wheel suspension units (20) and arranged triangular in relation to each other such that the first idler wheel (1) runs on a first rail (14) and the second idler wheel (2) and third idler wheel (3) one behind the other on a second rail (16). The rails (14, 16) form a track (10) for the travelling cleaner (12) and are positioned next to each other and above textile machines of the textile finishing installation.

Abstract (de)

Wanderreiniger (12) für textile Fertigungsanlagen dessen Wagen ein auf drei Laufrädern (1, 2, 3) abgestütztes Traggestell (18) aufweist. Die Laufräder (1, 2, 3) sind in Radaufhängungseinheiten (20) aufgehängt und im Dreieck derart zueinander angeordnet, dass das erste Laufrad (1) auf einer ersten Schiene (14) und das zweite Laufrad (2) und das dritte Laufrad (3) hintereinander auf einer zweiten Schiene (16) laufen, wobei die Schienen (14, 16) eine Fahrbahn (10) für den Wanderreiniger (12) bilden und nebeneinander, oberhalb von Textilmaschinen der textilen Fertigungsanlage angeordnet sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01H 11/00; D01H 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01H 11/00 (2006.01); D01H 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 13/005 (2013.01); D01H 11/006 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1057908 A1 20001206; EP 1057908 B1 20030625; AU 4283600 A 20001218; DE 59906098 D1 20030731; ES 2202964 T3 20040401; US 2002069786 A1 20020613; US 6601521 B2 20030805; WO 0073551 A1 20001207

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130529

2014-06-06 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140606

2014-03-13 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59906098

- Effective date: 20131203

2014-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130528

2014-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131203

2014-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2013-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120525

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120529

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20120503

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120523

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-11-16 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

2007-07-31 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: LUWA TEXTILE AIR ENGINEERING AG

- Free text: ZELLWEGER LUWA AG#WILSTRASSE 11#8610 USTER (CH) -TRANSFER TO- LUWA TEXTILE AIR ENGINEERING AG#WILSTRASSE 11#8610 USTER (CH)

2004-06-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040326

2004-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2202964 T3

2003-07-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59906098 P 20030731

2003-07-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAAD, BALASS, MENZL & PARTNER AG

2003-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES IT LI

2003-05-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KELLER,ARNOLD

2003-05-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ZEMP WERNER

2003-05-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DUERIG,CHRISTIAN

2001-08-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE ES IT LI

2001-08-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010605

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES IT LI

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI