Global Patent Index - EP 1057910 A1

EP 1057910 A1 2000-12-06 - Fastening arrangement for a twisting head

Title (en)

Fastening arrangement for a twisting head

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Befestigung eines Zwirnkopfes

Title (fr)

Aménagement pour la fixation d'une tête de retordage

Publication

EP 1057910 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00102494 A

Priority

DE 19925528 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19925528C1] The assembly for mounting a twister head (1) to a carrier plate (2), at a yarn twisting machine, has a ratchet locking ring (3) bonded to the carrier plate (2) with a number of ratchet projections (4) aligned radially inwards. Ratchets (7) are aligned radially outwards, in a matching number to the projections, forming a ratchet ring (6) at the housing (5) of the twister head (1). The outer dia. of the ratchets (7) is larger than the inner dia. of the ratchet projections (4), and the gap between the projections (4) is greater than the width of the ratchets (7). The under side (8) of each ratchet (7), towards the twister head (1), has a recess (9) to hold the upper side (10) of a ratchet projection (4) towards the carrier plate (2).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Vorrichtung zur lösbaren Befestigung eines Zwirnkopfes (1) an einem Tragblech (2) einer Zwirnmaschine. Nach dem Stand der Technik werden Zwirnköpfe mit mehreren Schrauben befestigt, was die Demontage und Montage des Zwirnkopfes an der Zwirnmaschine erheblich erschwert und das Risiko einer nicht sachgemäßen Befestigung birgt. Die Aufgabe, eine Vorrichtung zur lösbaren Befestigung eines Zwirnkopfes so weiterzubilden, daß eine schnelle Demontage und Montage des Zwirnkopfes möglich und eine hohe Betriebssicherheit gegeben ist wird gelöst durch einen mit dem Tragblech (2) fest verbundenen Rastring (3). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D02G 3/28; D01H 7/88

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01H 7/86 (2006.01); D02G 3/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 7/86 (2013.01); D02G 3/285 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19925528 C1 20000531; CN 1276446 A 20001213; EP 1057910 A1 20001206

INPADOC legal status


2003-02-26 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021219

2002-11-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020927

2001-08-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR IT

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001102

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI